Connecticut District Court
Judge:Victor A Bolden
Referred: Maria E Garcia
Case #: 3:20-cv-01675
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday May 05, 2021 5:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Jean Elizabeth Tomasco
Robinson & Cole
contact info
Defendant
Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Jean Elizabeth Tomasco
Robinson & Cole
contact info
Plaintiff
Coastal Connecticut Medical Group, LLC
Represented By
Michael J. Keane
Garfunkel Wild, P.C. - Ny
contact info
Roy W Breitenbach
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Roy Breitenbach
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
John G. Martin
Garfunkel Wild, P.C. - Ny
contact info
Plaintiff
Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC
Represented By
Michael J. Keane
Garfunkel Wild, P.C. - Ny
contact info
Roy W Breitenbach
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Roy Breitenbach
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
John G. Martin
Garfunkel Wild, P.C. - Ny
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven A.R. Murphy
Represented By
Michael J. Keane
Garfunkel Wild, P.C. - Ny
contact info
Roy W Breitenbach
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Roy Breitenbach
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
John G. Martin
Garfunkel Wild, P.C. - Ny
contact info
Plaintiff
Murphy Medical Associates, LLC
Represented By
Michael J. Keane
Garfunkel Wild, P.C. - Ny
contact info
Roy W Breitenbach
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Roy Breitenbach
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
John G. Martin
Garfunkel Wild, P.C. - Ny
contact info
Plaintiff
North Stamford Medical Associates, LLC
Represented By
Michael J. Keane
Garfunkel Wild, P.C. - Ny
contact info
Roy W Breitenbach
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Roy Breitenbach
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
John G. Martin
Garfunkel Wild, P.C. - Ny
contact info

GPO Mar 11 2022
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 30. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/11/2022. (Canevari, D.)
GPO Oct 18 2022
ORDER granting 50 Motion for Reconsideration re 48 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Murphy Medical Associates, LLC, North Stamford Medical Associates, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Coastal Connecticut Medical Group, LLC, Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/18/2022. (Burman, A.)
GPO May 12 2023
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/12/23. (Meyer, W.)
GPO Aug 30 2023
ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Sanctions 72 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are precluded from offering evidence in support of the 10,619 Itemized Claims in Exhibit 1, the Itemized Claims pertaining to the 1,020 Patients in Exhibit 2, the 1,072 Itemized Claims in Exhibit 3, and the 376 Itemized Claims in Exhibit 4 (in the Begos Suppl. Decl. 108). The Court also awards Defendants' reasonable attorneys' fees for prosecution of their Motion for Sanctions, the specific amount of which remain to be determined. Defendants shall submit their application for associated reasonable fees with the requisite documentation within 30 days. Plaintiffs' response may be filed up to 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/30/23. (Meyer, William)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, January 09, 2025
161 161 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 01/09 4:08 PM
REPLY to Response to157 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick)
Related: [-]