Green v. Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company, Limited
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11375
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11375
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-51004 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Nov 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company, Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric D. Green, as Trustee of the Takata Airbag Tort Compensation Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 20 2021
Opinion Regarding Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss (Related Document(s) 37) (JMW) |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
64 | 64
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/16 2:18 PM
[COPY OF ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT] Order Affirming Bankruptcy's Court Order Order Signed on 6/30/23. (LCN) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/16 2:22 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-51004 Closed (LCN) |