New York Northern District Court
Judge:Lawrence E Kahn
Referred: Therese Wiley Dancks
Case #: 5:20-cv-01376
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2020
Terminated:Jul 22, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday May 04, 2021 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Kik Custom Products
Plaintiff
Joseph Spruill
4295 U.S. Route 11 Apartment C-3
Cortland, NY 13045
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Camron Fuller
Terminated: 04/27/2021

GPO Nov 30 2020
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: ORDERED that Plaintiff's # 2 IFP Application is GRANTED; and it is further RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Title VII claims against Defendant Kik Custom Products survive initial review and require a response; and it is further RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's ADEA claims against Defendant Kik Custom Products be DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO REPLEAD pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B); and it is further RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Title VII and ADEA claims against Defendant Camron Fuller be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) for failure to state a claim; and it is further RECOMMENDED that the Clerk be directed to terminate Defendant Camron Fuller from the docket; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk provide Plaintiff with a copy of this Order and Report-Recommendation, along with a copy of the unpublished decision cited herein in accordance with the Second Circuit decision in Lebron v. Sanders, 557 F.3d 76 (2d Cir. 2009) (per curiam).( Objections to R&R due by 12/14/2020, Case Review Deadline 12/17/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/25/2020. {Copy served upon Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail}(pjh, )
GPO Apr 27 2021
DECISION AND ORDERED, that the Report-Recommendation (Dkt. No. 5) is APPROVED and ADOPTED in its entirety; and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiffs Title VII claims against Kik Custom Products survive initial review and require a response; and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiffs ADEA claims against Kik Custom Products are DISMISSED with leave to replead pursuant to § 1915(e)(2)(B); and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiffs Title VII and ADEA claims against Camron Fuller are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to § 1915(e)(2)(B) for failure to state a claim; and it is further ORDERED, that the Clerk shall TERMINATE Camron Fuller from the docket Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on April 27, 2021. (Copy served via regular mail)(sas)

Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Monday, August 15, 2022
55 55 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 08/15 10:16 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joseph Spruill submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (Files, Ryan)
Related: [-]