New York Southern District Court
Judge:Nelson Stephen Roman
Referred: Judith C Mccarthy
Case #: 7:20-cv-09346
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2020
Terminated:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 06, 2021 4:28 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Frank Tufano
Represented By
Jeffrey Kevin Davis
Davis & Associates PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Frank Tufano
Represented By
Jeffrey Kevin Davis
Davis & Associates PC
contact info
Defendant
Frank Tufano
248 Westchester Avenue
Thornwood, NY 10594
Represented By
Jeffrey Kevin Davis
Davis & Associates PC
contact info
Defendant
Frankie's Free-Range Meat, LLC
Plaintiff
Paul Saladino, MD
Represented By
David Dong Ann Lin
Lewis & Lin, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
70 70 misc Letter Thu 05/01 10:03 AM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy from David D. Lin dated May 1, 2025 re: Request for Conference. Document filed by Paul Saladino, MD..(Lin, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
69 69 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 04/30 12:51 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Frank Tufano. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit.(km) Modified on 4/30/2025 (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Appeal Wed 04/30 12:55 PM
***NOTICE TO FILER REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to filer regarding Document No. 69 Notice of Appeal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order/judgment being appealed was not selected; the document does not state which Court you are appealing to. The appeal is not as to form. Resubmit the Appeal to the Pro Se office. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
68 68 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 04/30 12:24 PM
REPONSE TO SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO VACATE INQUEST AND REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT OF CASE DUE TO MEDICAL EMERGENCY re:65 MOTION to Vacate.. Document filed by Frank Tufano. (jjc)
Related: [-]
67 67 motion Dismiss Wed 04/30 10:53 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS. Document filed by Frank Tufano. (jjc)
Related: [-]