Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Catherine D Perry
Case #: 4:20-cv-01596
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2020
Terminated:Jan 27, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 08, 2021 3:40 AM CDT
Defendant
City of Breckenridge Hills
Represented By
Joseph Neely
Behr Mccarter PC
contact info
Timothy J. Reichardt
Reichardt Torbitzky LLC
contact info
Defendant
Paul Rinck
Represented By
Joseph Neely
Behr Mccarter PC
contact info
Timothy J. Reichardt
Reichardt Torbitzky LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Branstetter
Represented By
Joseph Neely
Behr Mccarter PC
contact info
Timothy J. Reichardt
Reichardt Torbitzky LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Khalil Harbin
Represented By
Kiara Nayo Drake
Khazaeli And Wyrsch LLC
contact info
James R. Wyrsch
Khazaeli And Wyrsch LLC
contact info
Javad M. Khazaeli
Khazaeli And Wyrsch LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Friday, January 27, 2023
order A Docket Text Order Fri 01/27 1:30 PM
Docket Text ORDER as to Stipulation for Dismissal48 : GRANTED, case is dismissed with prejudice with each side to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/27/2023. (NEP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
48 48 misc Stipulation Thu 01/26 8:09 AM
STIPULATION for Dismissal by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Wyrsch, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
47 47 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Thu 12/22 11:21 AM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the June 20, 2023 Jury Trial is vacated and all pending motions are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file, within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 2/5/2023.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/22/2022. (KRZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
46 46 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 12/20 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Khalil Harbin (Khazaeli, Javad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
45 45 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 12/01 4:26 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by John McCann Waldron for Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Waldron, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
44 44 adr Notice of Appointment of Neutral Tue 10/25 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Winters, Bradley A. Neutral selected by parties. [A COPY SENT TO SELECTED NEUTRAL THIS DATE](KEK)
Related: [-]
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Tue 10/25 2:03 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Khazaeli, Javad) filed by Khalil Harbin; ORDERED GRANTED. (ADR Completion Deadline due by 12/28/2022. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 1/11/2023.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/25/2022. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
42 42 adr Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report Mon 10/24 3:19 PM
Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin Neutral: Winters, Bradley A. Date of Conference: 12/06/2022 time: 9:00 am Location: JAMS, 190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 1100, St. Louis, MO 63105(Khazaeli, Javad)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Extension of Time to Complete Mediation Mon 10/24 3:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Khazaeli, Javad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
40 40 order Case Management Order - Amended Thu 07/14 3:02 PM
THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Modify the Case Management Order39 is GRANTED as follows: (ADR Completion Deadline due by 10/28/2022., ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 11/11/2022., Jury Trial set for 6/20/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3N - St. Louis before District Judge Catherine D. Perry.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 07/14/2022. (KRZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
39 39 motion Amend/Correct Tue 07/12 11:55 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct38 Case Management Order - Amended,,19 Case Management Order,, by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Khazaeli, Javad)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
38 38 order Case Management Order - Amended Fri 06/03 4:11 PM
SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Modify the Case Management Order36 is GRANTED as follows: Discovery Completion due by 1/16/2023. ADR Completion Deadline due by 9/1/2022. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 9/15/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2023. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3N - St. Louis before District Judge Catherine D. Perry. Pretrial Compliance due by 5/31/2023. Motion in Limine due by 6/10/2023. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 6/3/2022. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
37 37 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Fri 05/27 10:41 AM
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is set for a telephoneconference on Wednesday, June 1, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. regarding the parties joint motion to amend the case management order36 . (see full order for details.) Telephone Conference set for 6/1/2022 02:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Catherine D. Perry. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 05/27/2022. (KRZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
36 36 motion Amend/Correct Thu 05/26 3:46 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct25 Case Management Order - Amended, Second by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Khazaeli, Javad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
35 35 adr Notice of Appointment of Neutral Wed 05/18 4:00 PM
AMENDED NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Winters, Bradley A. Neutral selected by Parties(KRZ)
Related: [-]
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Wed 05/18 3:41 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Wyrsch, James); ORDERED GRANTED ( ADR Completion Deadline due by 8/1/2022., ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 8/15/2022.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 05/18/2022. (KRZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
33 33 adr Notice of Appointment of Neutral Tue 05/17 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Winters, Bradley A. Neutral selected by Parties. (A copy sent to Neutral this date.)(KRZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
32 32 adr Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report Mon 05/16 9:47 PM
Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin Neutral: Winters, Bradley A. Date of Conference: July 21, 2022 time: 9:00 AM Location: JAMS 190 Carondelet Plaza Suite 1100 Saint Louis, MO 63105(Wyrsch, James)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Extension of Time to Complete Mediation Mon 05/16 9:44 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Wyrsch, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Tue 05/10 1:10 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:29 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Designate Neutral by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Wyrsch, James) filed by Khalil Harbin ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 5/16/2022. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 05/10/2022. (ANP)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
29 29 motion Extension Mon 05/09 10:05 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Designate Neutral by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Wyrsch, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Tue 05/03 2:06 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:27 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Designate Neutral by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Wyrsch, James) filed by Khalil Harbin; ORDERED GRANTED. (Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 5/9/2022.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 5/3/2022. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
27 27 motion Extension Mon 05/02 9:41 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Designate Neutral by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Wyrsch, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
26 26 7 pgs order Order Referring Case to ADR Tue 01/11 2:46 PM
AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: James R. Wyrsch. ADR Completion Deadline due by 6/1/2022. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 6/15/2022. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 5/2/2022... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 01/11/2022. (ANP)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Case Management Order - Amended Tue 01/11 2:44 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Modify the Case Management Order24 is GRANTED as follows... Discovery Completion due by 10/14/2022, Non-Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2022, Jury Trial set for 3/27/2023 08:30 AM before District Judge Catherine D. Perry, Pretrial Compliance due by 3/7/2023... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 01/11/2022. (ANP)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 09, 2022
24 24 motion Amend/Correct Sun 01/09 10:39 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct19 Case Management Order,, by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Wyrsch, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
23 23 adr Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Designation of Neutral/Conference Report Mon 01/03 10:43 AM
Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of case shows the Designation of Neutral/ADR conference report has not been filed (pages 6-8 of document 20 ) . A written motion requesting an extension of the designation of neutral/ADR conference report filing deadline must be filed with the court within 5 days. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 1/7/2022.)(ANP)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
22 22 order A Docket Text Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 07/30 11:27 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ; attorney/firm Kiara N. Drake by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Drake, Kiara) filed by Khalil Harbin; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Kiara Nayo Drake terminated. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 7/30/2021. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney/Firm Thu 07/29 9:19 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Kiara N. Drake by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. (Drake, Kiara)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
20 20 8 pgs order Order Referring Case to ADR Fri 04/02 1:45 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: James R. Wyrsch. ADR Completion Deadline due by 2/1/2022. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 2/15/2022. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 12/27/2021... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/02/2021. (ANP)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Case Management Order Fri 04/02 1:43 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 2: STANDARD: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Discovery Completion due by 4/1/2022. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 4/8/2022. ADR Future Reference 12/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2022. Jury Trial set for 10/3/2022 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3N - St. Louis before District Judge Catherine D. Perry. Pretrial Compliance due by 9/13/2022. Motion in Limine due by 9/23/2022... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/02/2021. (ANP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
18 18 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Fri 03/26 2:50 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Khalil Harbin. . (Wyrsch, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
17 17 order A Docket Text Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 03/11 2:44 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ; attorney/firm Joseph Neely; Behr, McCarter & Potter, PC by Defendants Jennifer Branstetter, City of Breckenridge Hills, Paul Rinck. (Neely, Joseph) filed by City of Breckenridge Hills, Jennifer Branstetter, Paul Rinck; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Joseph Neely terminated. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/11/2021. (KEK)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Withdraw as Attorney/Firm Thu 03/11 11:50 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Joseph Neely; Behr, McCarter & Potter, PC by Defendants Jennifer Branstetter, City of Breckenridge Hills, Paul Rinck. (Neely, Joseph)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 03/11 8:15 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Timothy J. Reichardt. Related [+] Address updated in CM/ECF on 3/11/2021 (CMC)
Related: [-] ichardt, Timothy
Friday, February 26, 2021
14 14 order Rule 16 Order Fri 02/26 10:57 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/26/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/2/2021 11:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Catherine D. Perry. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 02/26/2021. (ANP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/24 2:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Paul Rinck Related [+]
Related: [-] ichardt, Timothy
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/24 2:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Jennifer Branstetter Related [+]
Related: [-] ichardt, Timothy
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/24 2:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by City of Breckenridge Hills Related [+]
Related: [-] ichardt, Timothy
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
10 10 order A Docket Text Order Tue 01/26 9:08 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:9 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time by Defendants Jennifer Branstetter, City of Breckenridge Hills, Paul Rinck. (Neely, Joseph) filed by City of Breckenridge Hills, Jennifer Branstetter, Paul Rinck; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Answer due date of 02/24/2021. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 01/26/2021. (ANP)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
9 9 motion Extension Mon 01/25 3:24 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time by Defendants Jennifer Branstetter, City of Breckenridge Hills, Paul Rinck. (Neely, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/25 3:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Paul Rinck Paul Rinck waiver signed on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Neely, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/25 3:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Breckenridge Hills City of Breckenridge Hills waiver signed on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Neely, Joseph)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/25 3:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jennifer Branstetter Jennifer Branstetter waiver signed on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Neely, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 01/25 3:04 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph Neely for Defendants Jennifer Branstetter, City of Breckenridge Hills, Paul Rinck. (Neely, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 01/25 3:01 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy J. Reichardt for Defendants Jennifer Branstetter, City of Breckenridge Hills, Paul Rinck. Related [+]
Related: [-] ichardt, Timothy
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
misc Case Opening Notification Tue 11/10 8:45 AM
Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued - 3. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
3 3 1 pgs misc Entry of Appearance Mon 11/09 5:08 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kiara Nayo Drake for Plaintiff KHALIL HARBIN. (Drake, Kiara)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Entry of Appearance Mon 11/09 5:04 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by James R. Wyrsch for Plaintiff KHALIL HARBIN. (Wyrsch, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/09 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT 4:20-cv-01596 against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8269653, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by KHALIL HARBIN.(Khazaeli, Javad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form Filing Form,
Att: 3 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver P. Rinck,
Att: 4 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver J. Branstetter,
Att: 5 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver BHPD