Pujol Moreira, et al v. Societe Generale, S.A. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-09380 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Nov 09, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday May 09, 2021 5:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
BNP Paribas, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Societe Generale, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ana H. Fraga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francisco Pujol Meneses
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorenzo Perez Pujol
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis R. Pujol Rojas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Julia Pujol Moreira
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pilar M. Pujol Meneses
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raul Pujol Meneses
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sara L. Pujol
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ines Maria Pujol Faget
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan B. Pujol Moreira
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
110 | 110
order
Memo Endorsement
Fri 07/07 12:38 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:109 Letter Withdrawal of attorney Stephen M. Cohen from the case filed by Societe Generale, S.A. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Stephen M. Cohen as counsel for Societe Generale. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/7/23) (yv) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
109 | 109
misc
Letter
Thu 07/06 5:54 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Stephen M. Cohen dated July 6, 2023 re: Withdrawal of attorney Stephen M. Cohen from the case. Document filed by Societe Generale, S.A...(Cohen, Stephen) |