Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-10922

Alabama Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 12
Judge:Bess M Parrish Creswell
Case #: 1:20-ap-01050
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2020
Terminated:Apr 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Kevin Granger
2688 Guy Branch Rd
Cottonwood, AL 36320
Defendant
Sonja Lee Granger
2688 Guy Branch Rd
Cottonwood, AL 36320
Plaintiff
DIVERSIFIED FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
JONES WALKER LLP 400 20th St. N. Ste 1100
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
C. Ellis Brazeal, III
Jones Walker
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Service Thu 04/08 12:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Acknowledgment of Dismissal
Monday, April 05, 2021
16 16 court Acknowledgment of Dismissal Mon 04/05 7:30 AM
In accordance with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as made applicable by Rule 7041, Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, this serves as acknowledgement of the parties joint stipulation of dismissal of this adversary proceeding without prejudice. This adversary proceeding will be closed. (Hagmaier, Tonya)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/05 12:26 PM
Adversary Case Closed 20-01050 (Non-Image Entry). (KC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
15 15 notice Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 04/02 3:54 PM
Joint Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Harry P. Long on behalf of John Kevin Granger, Sonja Lee Granger. (Long, Harry)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Withdrawal of Document Fri 04/02 3:52 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Document filed by Harry P. Long on behalf of John Kevin Granger, Sonja Lee Granger Related [+]. (Long, Harry)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant John Kevin Granger, Defendant Sonja Lee Granger
Thursday, April 01, 2021
12 12 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Motion Thu 04/01 5:12 PM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Harry P. Long on behalf of John Kevin Granger, Sonja Lee Granger. (Long, Harry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
court Hrg Cont Thu 03/04 9:35 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/06/2021 at 01:50 PM at ATT Conference Call: (877) 336-1839, Participant Code: 361328, Host: Carrie Moore. (CBM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by DIVERSIFIED FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
court Hrg Cont Wed 02/17 5:07 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/02/2021 at 01:50 PM at ATT Conference Call: (877) 336-1839, Participant Code: 361328, Host: Carrie Moore. (cmoore)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by DIVERSIFIED FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
court Hrg Cont Tue 01/12 12:32 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/09/2021 at 01:50 PM at ATT Conference Call: (877) 336-1839, Participant Code: 361328, Host: Carrie Moore. (cmoore)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by DIVERSIFIED FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Saturday, December 12, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing Sun 12/13 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/12/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Hearing
Thursday, December 10, 2020
10 10 court Set Hearing Thu 12/10 2:38 PM
Notice of Scheduling Conference Telephone Hearing Set Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 1/5/2021 at 01:50 PM at ATT Conference Call: (877) 336-1839, Participant Code: 361328, Host: Carrie Moore. (CBM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,9 Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/09 4:53 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Harry P. Long on behalf of John Kevin Granger, Sonja Lee Granger. (Long, Harry)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 14, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Service Sun 11/15 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - See Image Attached - Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/14/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Summons Issued
Thursday, November 12, 2020
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 11/12 3:32 PM
Summons Service Executed on John Kevin Granger 11/12/2020; Sonja Lee Granger 11/12/2020 . Related [+]. (Brazeal, C.)
Related: [-] 6 Summons Issued
6 6 court Summons Issued Thu 11/12 12:45 PM
Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff to be served on Defendant John Kevin Granger Date Issued 11/12/2020, Answer Due 12/14/2020; Sonja Lee Granger Date Issued 11/12/2020, Answer Due 12/14/2020. Execution of Summons to be done by 11/19/2020. (CR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
5 5 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 11/10 10:31 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by C. Ellis Brazeal III on behalf of DIVERSIFIED FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. (Brazeal, C.)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice of Submission Error/Refiling Tue 11/10 10:15 AM
Notice of Submission Error requiring refiling. -The certificate of service attached to the summons must not be pre-filled out at all.(ie no dates or signatures) Refile the summons and certificate of service only using the event "Request for issuance of summons". - Please refile a corrected document within 7 days or your pleading may be dismissed Related [+]. Corrected filing due by 11/17/2020. (JAW)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 09, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 11/09 5:32 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-01050 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 12967604, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/09 5:30 PM
Adversary case 20-01050 (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint against John Kevin Granger, Sonja Lee Granger. Fee Amount $350. filed by C. Ellis Brazeal III on behalf of DIVERSIFIED FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC. (Brazeal, C.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons in Adversary Proceeding