Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Terry F Moorer
Referred: P Bradley Murray
Case #: 1:20-cv-00538
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2020
Terminated:Dec 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 09, 2021 4:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Buc-ee's, LTD
Represented By
James Rebarchak
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Clay A. Lanham
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jimmy L. Steward
Represented By
Robert C. Epperson
contact info
Brian Traywick
Shunnarah Injury Lawyers, P.C.
contact info

GPO Jun 16 2021
Order, Plf's 22 MOTION to Substitute Correct Name for Defendant Buc-ee's, LTD & Leave to Amend Complaint is GRANTED, as modified, as set out. Parties are DIRECTED to confer & ensure this Court still has jurisdiction through diversity jurisdiction. Plf's amended complaint &, if necessary, amended notice of removal must be filed NLT 6/30/2021. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/15/21. (tot)
GPO Mar 09 2023
ORDER re: 70 Joint Stipulation for Pro Tanto Dismissal of Lawrence Levinson. All claims against Dft Levinson have been dismissal in accordance w/the joint notice. The case remains pending against Dfts Buc-ee's Alabama, LLC & Unifirst Corporation. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/9/23. (tot)
GPO Oct 30 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 88 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Wayne Sanders filed by Buc-ee's Alabama, LLC and GRANTING 83 MOTION to Exclude Testimony or Report of Jack Denver, filed by Unifirst Corporation. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/30/2023. (fz)
GPO Nov 09 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/09/2023. (KJA)
GPO Dec 12 2023
JUDGMENT in favor of Dft Buc-ee's Alabama, LLC & against Plf Jimmy L. Steward. This action is DISMISSED w/prejudice. The Clerk is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/12/23. (tot)
GPO Jan 02 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Dft UniFirst Corporation's 122 MOTION to Reconsider is construed as a supplemental motion for summary judgment which is GRANTED as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/2/24. (tot)
GPO Jan 02 2024
AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Dfts Buc-ee's Alabama, LLC, Unifirst Corporation & against Plf Jimmy L. Steward as set out. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/2/24. (tot)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
misc Exhibits Returned/Disposed Thu 02/13 4:24 PM
Exhibits (See Doc.209 ) Disposed of (shredded) pursuant to GenLR 79(f)(2) after notice to counsel; consisting of exhibits admitted at jury trial held between 11/28/23 & 12/7/23. (mab)
Related: [-]