The Young Men's Christian Association of Metr
Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Susan V Kelley |
Case #: | 2:14-bk-27174 |
Case Filed: | Jun 04, 2014 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 08, 2014 |
Claims Deadline: | Oct 31, 2014 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
The Young Men's Christian Association of Metropolitan Milwaukee, Inc.
161 W Wisconsin Ave Ste 4000
Milwaukee, WI 53203-2664 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
316 N. Milwaukee Street, Suite 201
Milwaukee, WI 53202 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
517 East Wisconsin Ave. Room 430
Milwaukee, WI 53202 |
Represented By
|
1. | Unsecured creditors back YMCA Chapter 11 plan 'in principle' - Milwaukee - Milwaukee Business Journal (bizjournals.com) |
Submitted Wed 12/03/2014 | |
2. | Metro Milwaukee YMCA files bankruptcy reorganization plan (jsonline.com) |
Submitted Mon 12/01/2014 | |
3. | Bankruptcy judge approves sale of YMCA properties (jsonline.com) |
Submitted Wed 10/01/2014 | |
4. | No new bidders for metro Milwaukee YMCA sites, Chapter 11 sale plan to proceed - Milwaukee - Milwaukee Business Journal (bizjournals.com) |
Submitted Tue 09/23/2014 | |
5. | Milwaukee's YMCA says it camps and other programs will stay open during its restructuring. - Bankruptcy Beat - WSJ (blogs.wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 06/05/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
Corrective Entry - Claims. Claim #135-2 contains an incorrect PDF image and the viewing of the claim has been restricted. (mlf, Deputy Clerk) |