Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry C Morgan, Jr
Referred: Lawrence R Leonard
Case #: 2:13-cv-00446
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2013
Terminated:Apr 28, 2014

Debtor
Clinton Frederick Mack
1270 Westchester Court
Mobile, AL 36695
Debtor
Vanessia Elizabeth Mack
1270 Westchester Court
Mobile, AL 36695
Last checked: Thursday Jan 01, 2015 6:58 AM EST
Appellant
Judy A. Robbins
Represented By
Kenneth Nicholson Whitehurst, III
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
Noah Mariano Schottenstein
U.S. Department Of Justice (g St)
contact info
Appellee
John W. Tripp
Represented By
Paul Kevin Campsen
Kaufman & Canoles PC
contact info
Andrew K Rudiger
Kaufman & Canoles Pc (norfolk)
contact info
Interested Party
USBC-Norfolk/NN (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Trustee
Debera F. Conlon

Docket last updated: 06/05/2014 4:14 PM EDT
Friday, August 09, 2013
1 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 09-71540 SCS. File received.(ldab, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 appellant designation issues,
Att: 2 file 1,
Att: 3 file 2 part a,
Att: 4 file 2 part b,
Att: 5 file 2 part c,
Att: 6 file 2 part d,
Att: 7 file 3,
Att: 8 file 4,
Att: 9 order 175,
Att: 10 order on appeal
2 2 Sealed Report. (ldab, )
Related: [-]