Amazon.com Inc. v. Fitzpatrick et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Tiffany M Cartwright |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-01662 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Nov 12, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 11, 2021 2:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
Chenmaoqing
|
|
Defendant
Putian Weisen Trading Co Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Jose A Pagan
|
|
Defendant
Jinjiangshi Ousaier Trade Co Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Zhuxiubing
|
|
Defendant
Quanfuwowangluokeji (Shenzhen) Youxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Kang Wang
|
|
Defendant
Yan Ruiqun
|
|
Defendant
Sabrina Kelly-Krejci
|
|
Defendant
Jinanshitianqiaoqunataishangmaoyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Handanshihanshanquzuochangmaoyiyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
Kelly Fitzpatrick
|
|
Defendant
Jesse A Fasnacht
|
|
Defendant
Brady Michael Abbott
|
|
Plaintiff
Amazon.com Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
order
Judgment
Fri 12/08 10:10 AM
STIPULATED JUDGMENT. Amazon is granted judgment against Fitzpatrick in the amount of $27,000.00, less any payments made by Fitzpatrick toward this judgment, plus Amazon's attorneys' fees to be established upon the conclusion of collection. This judgment shall bear interest at the statutory rate prescribed by 28 U.S.C. § 1961 from the date of entry. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MW) |
|
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment
Fri 12/08 10:06 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's27 Motion for Entry of Stipulated Judgment. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(MW) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s)
Mon 11/20 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Sabrina Kelly-Krejci (an individual), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rainwater, Lauren) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s)
Fri 11/10 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rainwater, Lauren) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Declaration
Fri 11/10 3:07 PM
DECLARATION of Lauren Rainwater ISO Motion for Entry of Stipulated Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs re27 MOTION for Judgment Stipulated Judgment (Rainwater, Lauren) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Judgment
Fri 11/10 3:04 PM
MOTION for Judgment Stipulated Judgment , filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 12/1/2023, (Rainwater, Lauren) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
order
2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 09/21 9:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby directed to file an additional status report no later than 11/20/2023. Entered as directed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (TC) |
|
motion
Motion Calendar
Thu 09/21 9:40 AM
Status report due NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 11/20/2023. (TC) |
||
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Wed 09/20 10:05 AM
STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Rainwater, Lauren) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s)
Wed 09/20 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Jesse A Fasnacht (an individual), Handanshihanshanquzuochangmaoyiyouxiangongsi (an unknown entity), Jinanshitianqiaoqunataishangmaoyouxiangongsi (an unknown entity), Jinjiangshi Ousaier Trade Co Ltd, Jose A Pagan, Putian Weisen Trading Co Ltd (an unknown entity ), Yan Ruiqun (an individual), Kang Wang (an unknown entity), Quanfuwowangluokeji (Shenzhen) Youxiangongsi (an unknown entity), Zhuxiubing (an unknown entity), Brady Michael Abbott (an individual) and Chenmaoqing (an unknown entity), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rainwater, Lauren) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 09/06 9:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby directed to file a report on the status of this case by 9/20/2023. Entered as directed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (TC) |
|
motion
Motion Calendar
Wed 09/06 9:35 AM
Status report due NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 9/20/2023. (TC) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned to Judge
Wed 08/30 1:29 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Tiffany M Cartwright. Judge Ricardo S. Martinez no longer assigned to the case. (LC) |
||
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Thu 01/20 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Sarah Cox for Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc. (Cox, Sarah) |
|
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/29 3:11 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's20 Unopposed Motion for Entry of Consent Decrees. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) |
|
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 09/30 2:14 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Consent Decrees , filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc.(Rainwater, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/16 1:07 PM
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc (Cox, Sarah) |
|
Friday, April 30, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/30 3:33 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's17 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/2/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/8/2021, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 8/16/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) |
|
Wednesday, April 28, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time-Other
Wed 04/28 3:58 PM
Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time Re Rule 26 Deadlines , filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc. Noting Date 4/28/2021, (Cox, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 08, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 02/08 2:49 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's15 Motion for Extension of Time. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/3/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/10/2021, Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time-Other
Thu 01/28 2:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time of Deadlines and For Rule 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report , filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc. Noting Date 2/5/2021, (Cox, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Expedite
Thu 01/21 3:10 PM
ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's11 Motion to Expedite for Expedited Discovery andAlternative Service. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Declaration
Thu 12/17 4:55 PM
DECLARATION of Michael Kettner filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc re11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Alternative Service (Cox, Sarah) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Declaration
Thu 12/17 4:54 PM
DECLARATION of Sarah Cox filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc re11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Alternative Service(Cox, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
11 | 11
motion
Expedite
Thu 12/17 4:53 PM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Alternative Service , filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc. Noting Date 1/8/2021, (Cox, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 12/10 1:46 PM
Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to request by plaintiff's counsel, the Court finds good cause to continue the following deadlines:FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/1/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/8/2021, Joint Status Report due by 2/16/2021. (LC) |
||
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Fri 12/04 5:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on SABRINA KELLY-KREJCI on 11/15/2020, filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc. (Cox, Sarah) |
|
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Fri 12/04 5:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on KELLY FITZPATRICK on 11/13/2020, filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc. (Cox, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Wed 11/18 1:31 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 12/30/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/16/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/23/2020. (LC) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Mon 11/16 12:32 PM
LETTER from Scott L. Commerson and Sarah E. Cox to William M. McCool, Clerk of the Court re6 Notice to Filer Re 1 Complaint, Notice of Filing Deficiency filed by Amazon.com Inc (Cox, Sarah) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Notice to Filer
Fri 11/13 9:30 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: re1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 11/13 9:17 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Brady Michael Abbott, Jesse A Fasnacht, Kelly Fitzpatrick, Sabrina Kelly-Krejci, Jose A. Pagan(SG) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 11/12 4:04 PM
ORDER re3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Scott R Commerson for Plaintiff Amazon.com, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 11/12 11:03 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY SCOTT R. COMMERSON FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Amazon.com, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6732518 (Cox, Sarah) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 11/12 10:54 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Cox, Sarah) |
|
1 | 1
63
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/12 4:59 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF against All Defendants Attorney Sarah Cox added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Amazon.com, Inc..(Cox, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Kelly Fitzpatrick, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Sabrina Kelly-Krejci, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Jose A. Pagan, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Jesse A. Fasnacht, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Brady Michael Abbott | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 11/12 4:55 PM
Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SG) |