Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Embry J Kidd
Case #: 6:20-cv-02093
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause05:0704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday May 11, 2021 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Midwest Dental Arts, Inc.
a Limited Liability Company Attn: Paul Futrell, Registered Agent 760 North Drive, Suite C
Melbourne, FL 32934
Represented By
Joseph C. Wood
Arcadier, Biggie & Wood, PLLC
contact info
Mauricio Arcadier
Arcadier & Associates, PA
contact info
Defendant
Jamey Schropp
Represented By
Joseph C. Wood
Arcadier, Biggie & Wood, PLLC
contact info
Mauricio Arcadier
Arcadier & Associates, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Miller
The Law Offices of Levy & Levy, P.A. 1000 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway South Pointe I, Suite 588
Sunrise, FL 33323
Represented By
Chad E. Levy
Law Offices Of Levy & Levy, P.A.
contact info
David Mitchell Cozad
Levy & Levy, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
31 31 2 pgs order Order dismissing case Tue 07/27 2:14 PM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re 30 Mediation Report. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/27/2021. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
30 30 adr Notice of selection of mediator Thu 07/22 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of Christina Magee as mediator by Christina Magee.(Magee, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
29 29 respoth Objection Thu 07/01 1:45 PM
OBJECTION re26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re21 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Midwest Dental Arts, Inc., Jamey Schropp. . (Wood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
28 28 order *Order pdf Mon 06/21 3:56 PM
ORDER the parties are directed to confer, and then advise the Court, on the selection of a mediator, on or before July 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/21/2021. (RMF)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Mon 06/21 3:54 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2021 Joinder of Parties due by 6/26/2021 Discovery due by 8/5/2022 Dispositive motions due by 9/6/2022 Pretrial statement due by 1/9/2023 All other motions due by 12/6/2022 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/7/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/7/2022 Trial Status Conference set for 1/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 2/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/19/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/21/2021. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 17, 2021
26 26 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 06/17 8:33 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 21 Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. I respectfully recommend that the Motion be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/17/2021. (RMN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
25 25 misc Case Management Report Mon 04/26 3:54 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
24 24 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Thu 04/22 2:28 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on July 21, 2021 at 10:00am before Christina Magee. (Wood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
23 23 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/23 11:20 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 16 Defendant Midwestern Dental Arts, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as moot. The Complaint has been amended since the filing of the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/23/2021. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
22 22 respm Response to motion Fri 02/26 4:33 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Stephanie Miller. (Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
21 21 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 02/22 10:05 AM
Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Wood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
20 20 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 02/17 4:14 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Defendant Midwestern Dental Arts, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The motion fails to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/17/2021. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
19 19 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/09 12:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Midwest Dental Arts, Inc., Jamey Schropp. (Wood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
18 18 order *Order no pdf Thu 01/28 11:42 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida have been amended effective February 1, 2021, and will apply, as amended and in accordance with the January 13, 2021 Standing Order, to this case for all filings made on or after February 1, 2021. Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the striking of non-compliant filings, dismissal of this action, or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/28/2021. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
17 17 6 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/26 2:28 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Midwest Dental Arts, Inc., Jamey Schropp with Jury Demand. filed by Stephanie Miller. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Stephanie Miller.(Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/15 1:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Midwest Dental Arts, Inc., Jamey Schropp. (Wood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Fri 12/18 2:36 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Midwest Dental Arts, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Wood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Fri 12/18 2:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re13 Related case/interested persons/ECF by Midwest Dental Arts, Inc.. (Wood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
13 13 order Related case/interested persons/ECF Thu 12/10 2:58 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER,INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing.(Defendants). Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/24/2020, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/24/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 12/10/2020. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
12 12 service Waiver of service executed Tue 12/01 9:24 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 12/01/2020 by Stephanie Miller as to Jamey Schropp. (Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of service executed Tue 12/01 9:23 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 12/01/2020 by Stephanie Miller as to Midwest Dental Arts, Inc.. (Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of appearance Tue 12/01 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mauricio Arcadier on behalf of Midwest Dental Arts, Inc. (Arcadier, Mauricio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
9 9 service Summons issued Wed 11/25 11:39 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Midwest Dental Arts, Inc. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Fri 11/20 2:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested persons order by Stephanie Miller. (Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Fri 11/20 2:36 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Stephanie Miller. Related case(s): No (Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
6 6 order *Order no pdf Thu 11/19 3:30 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/19/2020. (RMF)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations Thu 11/19 3:29 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/19/2020. (RMF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Interested persons order Thu 11/19 3:28 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/19/2020. (RMF)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Related case order and track 2 notice Thu 11/19 3:27 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER (FLSA) directing compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d). Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/19/2020. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 11/13 9:09 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv2093-T-78EJK. (LRB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/12 9:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Midwest Dental Arts, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17544751) filed by Stephanie Miller.(Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Summons