Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Carmen E Henderson
Case #: 5:20-cv-02565
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2020
Terminated:Nov 21, 2022
Last checked: Thursday May 13, 2021 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By
Erin D. Foley
Seyfarth Shaw - Chicago
contact info
Kyla J. Miller
Seyfarth Shaw - Chicago
contact info
Plaintiff
Diana Cranfield
Represented By
David W. Neel
Law Office Of David W. Neel
contact info

GPO Aug 10 2022
Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Costco's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 8/10/2022. (S,KL)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
93 93 oth_evt Costs Taxed Wed 12/28 2:19 PM
Costs Taxed against plaintiff in the amount of $9,591.05. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Linda P. Rhein, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s)91 . (R,Li)
Related: [-]