Washington Western District Court
Judge:David G Estudillo
Case #: 3:20-cv-06123
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2020
Terminated:Oct 26, 2021
Last checked: Saturday May 15, 2021 3:44 AM PDT
Defendant
William Florey Prosser
Represented By
Christopher B Rounds
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward J McLaughlin, Jr
Represented By
Erin Kathleen Olson
Law Office Of Erin K Olson
contact info
Jane Paulson
Paulson Coletti Trial Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Case Tue 10/26 11:25 AM
ORDER granting21 Stipulated MOTION FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
21 21 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 10/19 3:08 PM
Stipulated MOTION FOR DISMISSAL , filed by Defendant William Florey Prosser. Noting Date 10/25/2021, (Roessler, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 18, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 10/18 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Edward J McLaughlin, Jr (Olson, Erin)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 10/18 1:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Hon. David G. Estudillo for all further proceedings. Judge Benjamin H. Settle no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Fri 08/20 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Erin Kathleen Olson. Filed by Plaintiff Edward J McLaughlin, Jr. (Olson, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
17 17 order BHS Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM) Wed 06/23 9:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *FIVE DAY* Jury Trial is set for 4/19/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/12/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/10/2021, Motions due by 11/22/2021, Discovery completed by 12/20/2021, Dispositive motions due by 1/19/2022, Motions in Limine due by 3/14/2022, Pretrial Order due by 3/28/2022, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 3/29/2022, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 3/29/2022, Deposition Designations due by 3/29/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/22 10:01 AM
ORDER granting14 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date and Issuing Amended Case Scheduling Order, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The clerk of the court is hereby ordered to reset this trial date for two months later, from February 15, 2022 to April 19, 2022, and to issue an amended Case Scheduling Order reflecting this continuance. (KMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
15 15 respm Declaration Tue 06/15 2:17 PM
DECLARATION of Kenneth M. Roessler filed by Defendant William Florey Prosser re10 STIPULATED MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Roessler, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 06/15 2:16 PM
Stipulated MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND TO ISSUE AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER , filed by Defendant William Florey Prosser. Noting Date 6/15/2021, (Roessler, Kenneth) Modified on 6/15/2021 to correct typo. (KMC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 10, 2021
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 06/10 9:13 AM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by William Florey Prosser.(Roessler, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 22, 2021
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 05/22 11:53 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) William Florey Prosser with JURY DEMAND, filed by Edward J McLaughlin, Jr.(Olson, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 05/18 8:25 AM
ORDER granting Stipulated10 Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney for Defendant, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Christopher B Rounds, and the law firm of Rounds Law Office, are permitted to withdraw as attorneys of record for defendant William Prosser. Kenneth Roessler, and the law firm of Mix Sanders Thompson PLLC, are hereby substituted as counsel. (KMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
10 10 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 05/13 3:18 PM
STIPULATED MOTION to Substitute Attorney, filed by Defendant William Florey Prosser. (Rounds, Christopher) Modified on 5/13/2021. (KMC)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public, notice to parties) Thu 05/13 4:39 PM
Noting Date Set by clerk to 5/13/2021 re10 Stipulated Motion to Substitute Attorney. (KMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
9 9 order BHS Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM) Wed 04/21 8:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *FIVE DAY* Jury Trial is set for 2/15/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joinder of Parties due by 5/21/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/9/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 9/8/2021, Motions due by 9/20/2021, Discovery completed by 10/18/2021, Dispositive motions due by 11/17/2021, Motions in Limine due by 1/10/2022, Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2022, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 1/25/2022, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 1/25/2022, Deposition Designations due by 1/25/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
8 8 misc Joint Status Report Tue 03/16 3:30 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Olson, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/24 2:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by William Florey Prosser.(Rounds, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/29 1:46 PM
Deadlines reset pursuant to the agreement of the parties: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/4/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/11/2021, Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2021. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/04 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher B Rounds on behalf of Defendant William Florey Prosser. (Rounds, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
5 5 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Thu 12/17 4:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on William Florey Prosser on 12/16/2020, filed by Plaintiff Edward J McLaughlin, Jr. (Olson, Erin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
4 4 order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Fri 11/20 10:16 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/4/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/11/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
3 3 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Wed 11/18 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Jane Paulson. Filed by Plaintiff Edward J McLaughlin, Jr. (Paulson, Jane)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 11/18 9:43 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant William Florey Prosser (MET)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 11/18 9:40 AM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (MET)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/16 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT for Wrongful Death against defendant(s) William Florey Prosser with JURY DEMAND Related [+], filed by Edward J McLaughlin, Jr.(Olson, Erin)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-6740776
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons