Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffery P Hopkins
Case #: 9:11-bk-06750
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2011
Dismissed:Oct 25, 2011
Terminated:Dec 09, 2011

Debtor
Peter McFarland
798 Partridge Ct
Marco Island, FL 34145-5824
Represented By
Christian B Felden
Felden And Felden, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - FTM
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E. Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
J Steven Wilkes
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/12/2017 10:30 AM EDT
Sunday, April 10, 2011
1 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid) Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Statement of Current Monthly Income Not Filed. Filed by Christian B Felden of Felden and Felden, P.A. on behalf of Peter McFarland (Felden, Christian) Modified on 4/26/2011 (Berrier, Deanna).
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 4/10/2011. Filed by Christian B Felden of Felden and Felden, P.A. on behalf of Peter McFarland (Felden, Christian)
Related: [-]
3 3 Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by Christian B Felden of Felden and Felden, P.A. on behalf of Peter McFarland (Felden, Christian)
Related: [-]
4 4 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Christian B Felden on behalf of Debtor Peter McFarland. (Felden, Christian)
Related: [-]