Shepler v. City of New York
Original Case: 1:17-cv-10254
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03844 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 12, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 03, 2020 3:32 AM EST |
Defendant
City of New York
|
|
Defendant
New York City Police Department
|
|
Defendant
New York City Department of Corrections
|
|
Defendant
George R. Vierno Center
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Michael Collura
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Matthew Stephen Shepler
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/03/2020 3:28 AM EST |
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Stephen Shepler, FILED. [2974311] 20-3844 [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:42 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 47 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 12 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 02/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2974316] 20-3844 [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:44 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2974319] 20-3844 [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:45 PM] | |
4 | 4 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Stephen Shepler, FILED. Service date 03/10/2020 by US mail.[2974322] 20-3844 [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:46 PM] | |
5 | 5 2 pgs DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, [4], on behalf of Appellant Matthew Stephen Shepler, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2974326] 20-3844 [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:47 PM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2974333] 20-3844 [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:51 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |