PELZER V. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Lanzillo |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00325 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2024 |
Defendant
D. OVERMYER
|
|
Defendant
FORMER SECRETARY JEFFREY BEARD
|
|
Defendant
LEWIS FOLINO
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL CLARK
|
|
Defendant
PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
SECRETARY JOHN WETZEL
|
|
Defendant
TABB BICKELL
|
|
Plaintiff
CAINE PELZER
|
1. | Settlement in Erie federal court ends inmate's 15 straight years of solitary confinement (goerie.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/05/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
123 | 123
![]() ORDER The Court has been advised this day by counsel for all parties that a settlement has been reached and the only matter remaining to be completed is the submission of a stipulation for dismissal under Fed.R.Civ.P. 4l(a). It is therefore ORDERED that this case be Administratively Closed. Nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter, and Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo will retain jurisdiction should further proceedings regarding settlement become necessary. Further, if a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by Friday, May 3, 2024, the parties are ORDERED to file a status report with the Court. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 3/4/2024. (dlh) |
|
122 | 122
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 03/04 10:40 AM
Minute Entry. Today, March 4, 2024, the Court convened a voir dire conference prior to commencement of jury selection, during which the parties discussed certain legal issues likely to arise during the course of trial. In attendance were counsel for Defendants, Sen. Dep. Atty. Gen. Scott Bradley and Atty. Chase Defelice, and counsel for Plaintiff, Atty. John Mizner and Atty. Joe Caufield. (Court Reporter: none) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rlh) |
|
Saturday, March 02, 2024 | ||
121 | 121
minutes
Status Conference Motion Hearing
Sat 03/02 12:16 PM
Minute Entry. Today, March 2, 2024, the Court convened a telephonic status conference to address Defendants' motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 118) of the Court's Order113 granting Plaintiff's motion to exclude evidence related to administrative remedies78 and denying Defendants' motion to exclude evidence and testimony of unexhausted claims81 . In attendance were counsel for Defendants, Attorney Scott A. Bradley and Attorney Chase M DeFelice, and counsel for Plaintiff, Attorney John F. Mizner and Attorney Joseph Caufield. For the reasons stated on the conference record, the Court granted Defendants' motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 118) and re-affirmed its Order at ECF No. 113 in its entirety. Further, and for the reasons stated on the conference record, the Court directed Defendants to disclose certain pre-trial documents to Plaintiff by today, March 2, 2024. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rlh) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
120 | 120
![]() RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to118 Motion for Reconsideration, filed by CAINE PELZER. (Mizner, John) |
|
119 | 119
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 03/01 4:57 PM
ORDER. A telephonic status conference is hereby set for 3/2/2024 at 11:00 AM before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo to address Defendants' motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 118). The conference will be conducted via the Court's conference call system. Instructions for accessing the system have been emailed to Counsel separately. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on March 1, 2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rlh) |
|
118 | 118
![]() MOTION for Reconsideration re113 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,, Order on Motion for Hearing,, by TABB BICKELL, SECRETARY JOHN WETZEL. (Defelice, Chase) |
|
117 | 117
![]() Witness List by TABB BICKELL, SECRETARY JOHN WETZEL. (Bradley, Scott) |
|
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
116 | 116
![]() EXHIBITS in Support of109 Brief in Support - Other by CAINE PELZER. (Mizner, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
115 | 115
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 02/29 10:02 AM
ORDER. Pursuant to Fed. R Civ. P. 41(a), Plaintiff Caine Pelzer, by his attorneys at the Mizner Law Firm, and Defendants by their counsel, Scott Bradley and Chase M. Defelice, hereby stipulate to the dismissal of all claims against Former Secretary Jeffrey Beard, with prejudice. ECF No. 114. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on February 29, 2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rlh) |
|
114 | 114
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by CAINE PELZER. (Mizner, John) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
113 | 113
![]() ORDER Defendants' Motion to Exclude Evidence and Testimony of Unexhausted Claims (ECF No.81 ), and Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Evidence Related to Administrative Remedies (ECF No.78 ). For the reasons discussed in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED and Defendant's motion is DENIED. No evidence or argument regarding Defendants' affirmative defense of failure to exhaust administrative remedies shall be offered or admitted at trial. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 2/28/2024. (dlh) |
|
112 | 112
![]() MEMORANDUM OPINION re78 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence related to Administrative Remedies filed by CAINE PELZER,81 MOTION in Limine (First) to Exclude Evidence and Testimony of Unexhausted Claims by FORMER SECRETARY JEFFREY BEARD, TABB BICKELL, SECRETARY JOHN WETZEL. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 2/28/2024. (dlh) |
|
111 | 111
![]() CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by TABB BICKELL. (Bradley, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
110 | 110
![]() RESPONSE to Motion re74 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence related to Administrative Remedies filed by TABB BICKELL, FORMER SECRETARY JEFFREY BEARD, SECRETARY JOHN WETZEL. (Defelice, Chase) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
109 | 109
![]() BRIEF in Support of74 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence related to Administrative Remedies filed by CAINE PELZER. (Mizner, John) |
|
108 | 108
![]() OMNIBUS MEMORANDUM ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE. For the reasons stated in the attached memorandum order and fully stated on the record during the final pretrial conference (ECF No. 107), the Court (1) GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiff's motion to exclude Defendants' expert report (ECF No.75 ); (2) GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants' motion to exclude certain evidence and testimony regarding settlement discussions, grievances/lawsuits, and references to "solitary confinement" (ECF No.83 ); (3) GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants' motion to exclude evidence and testimony regarding Plaintiff's March 11, 2009 RRL placement (ECF No.85 ); (4) DENIES Defendants' motion to exclude evidence and testimony regarding damages (ECF No.87 ); (5) GRANTS Defendants' motion to admit evidence and testimony of Plaintiff's felony conviction, institutional misconducts, and gang involvement (ECF No.89 ); and (6) DENIES as moot Plaintiff's motion to preclude Defendants from introducing testimony on certain subjects (ECF No.101 ). Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on February 27, 2024. (rlh) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
107 | 107
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Final
Mon 02/26 4:39 PM
Minute Entry. Today, February 26, 2024, the Honorable Chief United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo convened a Final Pretrial Conference. At the conference, the Court heard arguments on the parties' motions in limine, preliminarily ruled on the motions, and discussed logistics for trial, which is scheduled to begin Monday, March 4, 2024. In attendance at the conference were counsel for Defendants, Sen. Dep. Atty. Gen. Scott A. Bradley, and counsel for Plaintiff, Atty. John F. Mizner and Atty. Joseph Caufield. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rlh) |