California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:20-cr-03650
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 18, 2020 11:16 PM PST
Defendant
Kyle Mason Croll (1)
Represented By
Isaac Blumberg
contact info
Material Witness
Lorenza Gomez-Basilio
Represented By
Jonathan D Frank
Law Office Of Jonathan D Frank
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Loren Gail Rene
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Aug 27 2021
JUDGMENT as to Kyle Mason Croll (1), Count 1: Custody of BOP for a term of Time Served. Supervised release for 3 years. $100 Assessment. Fine Waived. $5000 JVTA-Waived. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw (bjb)

Docket last updated: 11/19/2020 12:09 AM PST
Saturday, October 31, 2020
Arrest of Kyle Mason Croll (no document attached) (aef) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Kyle Mason Croll.(aef) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Jonathan D Frank for Lorenza Gomez-Basilio appointed. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Kyle Mason Croll: Initial Appearance set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (mxn) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Initial Appearance as to Kyle Mason Croll held on 11/2/2020. The defendant consents to VTC. Appointed Attorney Isaac Blumberg(n/a) provisionally for Kyle Mason Croll. Financial Affidavit due by 11/12/20. ( Status Hearing re Counsel set for 11/12/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin.) Bond set as to Kyle Mason Croll (1) $10,000 PS secured by defendant signature. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/12/20 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Arraignment set for 11/24/20 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. (CD# 11/2/2020 MDD 20-1:3:44-3:54). (Plaintiff Attorney Shivanjali Sewak AUSA, Christopher Beeler AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Michelle Angeles FD-S/A). (aje) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Kyle Mason Croll (no document attached) (aje) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Kyle Mason Croll (no document attached) (aje) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Kyle Mason Croll (1) $10,000 PS Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 11/2/2020. (vxc) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Isaac Blumberg appearing for Kyle Mason Croll (Blumberg, Isaac) (mcb). [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
8 8 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Kyle Mason Croll: Arraignment of MW set for 11/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (lrc) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Loren Gail Rene appearing for USA. Related [+]Attorney Loren Gail Rene added to party USA(pty:pla) (smd). [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-] ne, Loren
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Arraignment of Material Witness Lorenza Gomez-Basilio held on 11/4/2020. The Court confirms the appointment of attorney Jonathan Frank(n/a). Material Witness bail set at $15,000 PS w/10% percent cash deposit.(CD# 11/4/2020 MDD 20-1:2:58-3:02). (Interpreter Deborah Berry)(Plaintiff Attorney Shivanjali Sewak AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
11 11 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Kyle Mason Croll on $10,000 P/S Bond. (smd) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Lorenza Gomez-Basilio. Material Witness Bond set for $15,000 P/S. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 11/04/2020. (smd) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2020
13 13 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Kyle Mason Croll (Blumberg, Isaac) (zda). [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
15 15 P/S Bond Filed as to Kyle Mason Croll in amount of $10,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (Document applicable to USA, Kyle Mason Croll.) (zda)(jrd) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
14 14 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): Preliminary Hearing set for 11/12/2020 vacated (no document attached) (dls) Modified on 11/9/2020 (dls). [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
16 16 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kyle Mason Croll (dls) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): Financial affidavit submitted and approved. As such, the Court vacates the Status Hearing set for 11/12/2020. (no document attached) (dls) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
18 18 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Kyle Mason Croll. At the request of defense counsel, with no objection from the government, Arraignment RESET for 11/17/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Defendant ordered to appear at hearing.(dls) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Kyle Mason Croll. At the request of material witness counsel, Motion Hearing - Material Witness set for 12/1/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (dls) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
20 20 MOTION to Take Deposition , MOTION for reports pursuant to federal rules of criminal procedure, rule 46(h)(1) and (2) by Lorenza Gomez-Basilio as to Kyle Mason Croll.(Frank, Jonathan) (zda). [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration,
Att: 2 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
21 21 Joint MOTION for Release of Material Witness Lorenza Gomez-Basilio by Kyle Mason Croll. (Blumberg, Isaac) (zda). [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
22 22 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA Related [+] (jcj). [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-] ne, Loren
23 23 NOTICE of Judge Assignment ( re22 Lodged Information): District Judge Dana M. Sabraw is assigned. Case Number 20-cr-03650 DMS. (no document attached) (jcj) [3:20-mj-04755-MDD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
24 24 1 pgs INFORMATION as to Kyle Mason Croll (1) count(s) 1. (mme)(jrd)
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER Granting21 Motion for Release of Material Witness as to Kyle Mason Croll (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/17/2020.(mme)
Related: [-]
26 26 STIPULATION OF FACT AND JOINT MOTION FOR RELEASE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Lorenza Gomez-Basilio as to defendant Kyle Mason Croll and Order Thereon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/17/2020. (mme)
Related: [-]
27 27 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Material Witness Lorenza Gomez-Basilio (tkl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt
28 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Arraignment on Information as to Kyle Mason Croll (1) Count 1 held on 11/17/2020. Defendant present on bond. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 1/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Stipulation of joint motion for release of material witness submitted. Court signed order. Material witness abstract issued. (CD# 11/17/2020 AHG 20:927-935). (Plaintiff Attorney Carl Brooker, S/A AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Isaac Blumberg, CJA). (nbp)
Related: [-]