Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eugene R Wedoff
Case #: 1:14-bk-21216
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jul 16, 2014
Claims Deadline:Sep 23, 2014
Terminated:Oct 21, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Wrigleyville Hotel LLC
3456 N Clark St
Chicago, IL 60657-1610
Represented By
Jonathan D. Golding
The Golding Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
Richard N Golding
The Golding Law Offices, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


1. Battle over Wrigleyville hotel project heats up (chicagobusiness.com)
Submitted Fri 06/13/2014
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
215 215 court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 10/21 2:14 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed . (Pruitt, Debra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2015
216 216 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal Thu 10/22 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal Related [+]. No. of Notices: 36. Notice Date 10/22/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 210 Order on Motion to Dismiss
214 214 order Approve Compromise or Settlement per Rule 9019 Wed 10/21 2:10 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Settlement Related [+], Granting Motion To Limit Notice. Signed on 10/20/2015. (Pruitt, Debra)
Related: [-] 202 202
213 213 order Approve Compromise or Settlement per Rule 9019 Tue 10/20 2:53 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Settlement Related [+], Granting Motion To Limit Notice. Signed on 10/20/2015. (Pruitt, Debra)
Related: [-] 200 200
212 212 order Approve Compromise or Settlement per Rule 9019 Tue 10/20 2:50 PM
Order Granting Motion To Limit Notice Related [+], Granting Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed on 10/20/2015. (Pruitt, Debra)
Related: [-] 199 199
211 211 order Approve Compromise or Settlement per Rule 9019 Tue 10/20 2:48 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Settlement Related [+], Granting Motion To Limit Notice. Signed on 10/20/2015. (Pruitt, Debra)
Related: [-] 201 201
210 210 order Dismiss Tue 10/20 12:49 PM
(E)Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Debtor Related [+]. Signed on 10/20/2015. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 203
209 209 misc Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements Tue 10/20 11:22 AM
Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements for Filing Period Ending September 2015 Filed by Sean P Williams on behalf of Wrigleyville LLC. (Williams, Sean)
Related: [-]
208 208 misc Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements Tue 10/20 11:22 AM
Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements for Filing Period Ending August 2015 Filed by Sean P Williams on behalf of Wrigleyville LLC. (Williams, Sean)
Related: [-]
207 207 misc Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements Tue 10/20 11:21 AM
Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements for Filing Period Ending September 2015 Filed by Sean P Williams on behalf of Wrigleyville Hotel LLC. (Williams, Sean)
Related: [-]
206 206 misc Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements Tue 10/20 11:20 AM
Summary of Cash Receipts and Disbursements for Filing Period Ending August 2015 Filed by Sean P Williams on behalf of Wrigleyville Hotel LLC. (Williams, Sean)
Related: [-]