Larocco et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-04027 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday May 17, 2021 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell International Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
Joel Larocco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Larocco
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Terminated: 05/12/2021
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PlaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Primeau, Robin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, May 12, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paula Yoakum, William Yoakum, Joel Larocco, Pamela Larocco, Beth Maldonado, Richard Castleberry as to Certain Named Defendants Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-04027-RMG, 2:20-cv-04028-RMG, 2:21-cv-00265-RMG, 2:21-cv-00298-RMG(Primeau, Robin) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice Other
Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() STATUS REPORT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.S GENERAL DENIAL AND PRELIMINARY STATEMENT OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Honeywell International Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Shealy, Kirby) |
|
Thursday, November 19, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 11/19 2:56 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Larocco et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-4027-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Kentucky (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9481548.), filed by Joel Larocco, Pamela Larocco. Service due by 2/16/2021(sshe, ) |