Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 8:20-cr-00340
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2020
Terminated:Jul 29, 2021
Last checked: Friday Nov 20, 2020 2:57 AM EST
Defendant
Gary Peter Harris (1)
Represented By
Richard C. Reinhart
Law Office Of Richard C. Reinhart
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patrick Scruggs
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2022 9:38 AM EDT
Monday, November 18, 2019
1 1 14 pgs COMPLAINT as to Gary Peter Harris (1). (DMS) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
Arrest of Gary Peter Harris on 11/20/2019. (DMS) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Gary Peter Harris (1) Non-Surety (Signature) Bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/20/2019. (CRH) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL MOTION for Bond by Gary Peter Harris. (DMS) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson: Granting 7 oral motion for bond; Initial Appearance as to Gary Peter Harris held on 11/20/2019. (DIGITAL) (Interpreter/Language: N/A) (DMS) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
4 4 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/20/2019 as to Gary Peter Harris. (CRH) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
5 5 Non-Surety (Signature) BOND entered as to Gary Peter Harris in amount of $30,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/20/2019. (CRH) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
9 9 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Gary Peter Harris. (Scruggs, Patrick) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2020
10 10 WAIVER of Right to Speedy Indictment by USA as to Gary Peter Harris. (Scruggs, Patrick) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
11 11 WAIVER of speedy trial through June 7, 2020 by Gary Peter Harris (Scruggs, Patrick) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
12 12 WAIVER of speedy trial through August 16, 2020 by Gary Peter Harris (Scruggs, Patrick) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
13 13 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Gary Peter Harris. Related [+] [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-] inhart, Richard
Monday, July 27, 2020
14 14 RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Gary Peter Harris re13 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Scruggs, Patrick) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER denying 13 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Gary Peter Harris (1) for the reasons stated by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/27/2020. (Wilson, Thomas) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
16 16 2 pgs Amended MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Gary Peter Harris. Related [+] [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-] inhart, Richard
17 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Gary Peter Harris (1) to the extent that the defendant may travel to Monroe County from August 1, 2020, to August 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/28/2020. (Wilson, Thomas) [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
18 18 WAIVER of Right to Speedy Indictment by Gary Peter Harris. Related [+] Modified text on 8/17/2020 (MCB). [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-] inhart, Richard
Thursday, October 08, 2020
19 19 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Gary Peter Harris. Related [+] [8:19-mj-02506-TGW]
Related: [-] inhart, Richard
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
20 20 6 pgs INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Gary Peter Harris (1) count(s) 1. (JLD)
Related: [-]