Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Sharion Aycock
Referred: Jane M Virden
Case #: 4:20-cv-00203
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2020
Terminated:Mar 30, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday May 19, 2021 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Attala County Jailors John Does 1-3
Defendant
Attala County, Mississippi
Represented By
Daniel J. Griffith
Jacks | Griffith | Luciano, P.A.
contact info
Mary McKay Griffith
Jacks/griffith/luciano, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Sheriff Nicholas Cox
Represented By
Daniel J. Griffith
Jacks | Griffith | Luciano, P.A.
contact info
Mary McKay Griffith
Jacks/griffith/luciano, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Sheriff Darrin Fleming
Represented By
Daniel J. Griffith
Jacks | Griffith | Luciano, P.A.
contact info
Mary McKay Griffith
Jacks/griffith/luciano, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Sheriff Tim Nail
Represented By
Daniel J. Griffith
Jacks | Griffith | Luciano, P.A.
contact info
Mary McKay Griffith
Jacks/griffith/luciano, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Shane Hubbert
3209 Attala Road 2267
McCool, MS 39108
Represented By
Sidney Ray Hill, III
Clayton O'Donnell, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
40 40 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/30 9:02 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice re39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Robert Shane Hubbert. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/30/2022. (tjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
39 39 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/29 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Shane Hubbert (jla)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
41 41 minutes Status Conference Wed 03/30 2:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/25/2022. (irw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
38 38 notice Notice of Conference Tue 03/22 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Conference:Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/25/2022 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
37 37 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/21 3:13 PM
ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/21/2022. (irw)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Conference Mon 03/21 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Final Pretrial-Settlement Conference RESET for 4/11/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than 3/31/2022. (irw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 24, 2022
35 35 misc Exhibits to Other Document Thu 02/24 10:14 AM
EXHIBIT re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,28 MOTION for Summary Judgment SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MSJ . (Griffith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit E to [Doc. 25] & C to [Doc. 28],
Att: 2 Exhibit F to [Doc. 25] & D to [Doc. 28],
Att: 3 Exhibit G to [Doc. 25] & E to [Doc. 28]
Monday, January 10, 2022
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 01/10 8:35 AM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Leave to File Document. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/10/22. (sko)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
notice Notice of Correction Mon 12/06 4:13 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re32 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Authorities to 28 ,33 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
33 33 9 pgs misc Memorandum in Support Thu 12/02 4:50 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re32 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Authorities to 28 filed by Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail. (Portner, Katherine)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Leave to File Document Thu 12/02 4:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Authorities to 28 by Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail. (Portner, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Notice of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit D MOA to MSJ
31 31 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 12/02 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Mayo Portner on behalf of Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail (Portner, Katherine)
Related: [-]
30 30 24 pgs misc Memorandum in Support Thu 12/02 9:45 AM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Attala County, Mississippi, Tim Nail. (Griffith, Mary)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 12/02 2:35 PM
Remark: Video labeled as Exhibit B re25 received and on file in Oxford clerk's office. (jtm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 26, 2021
29 29 misc Status Report Fri 11/26 6:10 PM
STATUS REPORT . (Griffith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Criminal Case Order
28 28 motion Summary Judgment Fri 11/26 6:08 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attala County, Mississippi, Tim Nail. (Griffith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Fleming Training Certificates,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Cox Training Certificates
27 27 notice Notice of Conventional Filing Fri 11/26 6:06 PM
NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Exh B to25 Body Cam Footage by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming. (Griffith, Mary)
Related: [-]
26 26 30+ pgs misc Memorandum in Support Fri 11/26 6:05 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming. (Griffith, Mary)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Fri 11/26 6:04 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming. (Griffith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A ACSO File,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Body Cam Footage,
Att: 3 Exhibit C ACSO Booking Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit D Justice Court File
Friday, April 16, 2021
utility Set/Reset Case Management Order Deadlines Fri 04/16 1:06 PM
Set/Reset Case Management Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 11/14/2021. Motions due by 11/28/2021. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 8/7/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 9/6/2021. (jla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/15 1:58 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/15/2021. (ck)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/15 1:57 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sidney Ray Hill, III terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/15/2021. (ck)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
22 22 motion Extension of Time Mon 03/29 10:39 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Discovery by Robert Shane Hubbert. (Hill, Sidney)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/29 10:38 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert Shane Hubbert. (Hill, Sidney)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/12 2:08 PM
NOTICE by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (Griffith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A SDT to Premier Rehab
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/12 2:07 PM
NOTICE by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (Griffith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A SDT to Premier Medical Group
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Service Tue 03/09 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Discovery by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail to Plaintiff. (Griffith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Conference Thu 03/04 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later then seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/04 3:48 PM
ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/4/2021. (irw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Trial Wed 03/03 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 5/16/2022 09:40 AM in Aberdeen Bankruptcy Courthouse - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (tjw)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Case Management Order Wed 03/03 2:26 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 9/23/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 4/2/2021. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 6/23/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 7/23/2021. Motions due by 10/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/3/2021. (irw)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Case Management Conference Wed 03/03 11:49 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 3/3/2021. (irw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Service Thu 02/25 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Sidney Ray Hill, III on behalf of Robert Shane Hubbert to Defendants. (Hill, Sidney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Service Thu 02/04 9:03 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Core Disclosures by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail to Plaintiff. (Griffith, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
10 10 order Initial Order - Rule 16.1 Wed 02/03 10:49 AM
INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2021 at 10:00 AM via Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/3/2021. (irw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 12/16 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail (Griffith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/15 2:05 PM
AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to1 Complaint by Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail. (Griffith, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 12/15 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail (Griffith, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/04 10:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Ray Hill, III on behalf of Robert Shane Hubbert Darrin Fleming served on 11/25/2020. (Hill, Sidney)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/04 10:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Ray Hill, III on behalf of Robert Shane Hubbert Nicholas Cox served on 11/25/2020. (Hill, Sidney)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/04 10:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Ray Hill, III on behalf of Robert Shane Hubbert Tim Nail served on 11/24/2020. (Hill, Sidney)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/04 10:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Ray Hill, III on behalf of Robert Shane Hubbert Attala County, Mississippi served on 11/24/2020. (Hill, Sidney)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 11/20 2:16 PM
Summons Issued as to Attala County, Mississippi, Nicholas Cox, Darrin Fleming, Tim Nail; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/20 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1877749, filed by Robert Shane Hubbert. (jla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Fri 11/20 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
Related: [-]