Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Robert M Dow, Jr
Case #: 1:20-cv-06918
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2020
Terminated:Apr 09, 2021
Last checked: Saturday May 22, 2021 5:10 AM CDT
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Defendant
1StopCom
Defendant
51512123165 Store
Defendant
AOMYUIK
Defendant
Alanproth
Defendant
Allison bolly
Defendant
AngelStores Store
Defendant
Anime Costumes House Store
Defendant
Ao li gei
Defendant
BROWNSHOPP
Defendant
BSHB
Defendant
BY MOODA Store
Defendant
Baichuang
Defendant
BiancaCo
Defendant
COURTNEYJOHNSON
Defendant
CangNS
Defendant
Coynzu US
Defendant
Cuizongtan
Defendant
DSFBKEsnh
Defendant
Daijinquan
Defendant
Damenmode Agle Store
Defendant
Disney Baby Dreamer Store
Defendant
Donghai Environmental1
Defendant
EVDAY
Defendant
FUERMOR
Defendant
Fashion Shop 5
Defendant
GEUGNKDEW
Defendant
George Torres
Defendant
Goijhuh
Defendant
HAPPINESS BABES Store
Defendant
HAPPY WALK Official Store
Defendant
Heng Liu Fu
Defendant
Hiuyhuo
Defendant
Hundert
Defendant
Hzpexlite
Defendant
JNGHJX
Defendant
JinZhouZhangHongQiCheZuLinYouXianGongSi
Defendant
Jintao Ship Trading
Defendant
Josephyd
Defendant
Karnas Shop Store
Defendant
KaydraMa
Defendant
Kids capes
Defendant
LAUTEN
Defendant
LLD Drop Shipping Store
Defendant
LOTTJOKLD
Defendant
Looking up to the high end Store
Defendant
MInLen
Defendant
MianBEZ
Defendant
Midland Warehousing
Defendant
MikaylaSA
Defendant
Milksoft
Defendant
Montanaer
Defendant
Nicaoamz
Defendant
Northward Canton
Defendant
PARTY USA
Defendant
Penglai Huaxia Portuguese Garden Wine Co.,Ltd.
Defendant
PikerBigMonster
Defendant
QAZW36YES
Defendant
Quanzhou Pindu Trading Co.,Ltd.
Defendant
Reliable Shopping Store
Defendant
SENOAINK014
Defendant
SERES Store
Defendant
SIKHU-Y
Defendant
SUPDecor
Defendant
SZHSJH8
Defendant
Sarico Store
Defendant
Sgxnove
Defendant
Shenzhen Fanya Trading Co.,Ltd.
Defendant
Shop5366043 Store
Defendant
Shop5577182 Store
Defendant
Shop5593314 Store
Defendant
Shop5634194 Store
Defendant
Shop5873622 Store
Defendant
Shop5879383 Store
Defendant
Shop5952133 Store
Defendant
Shop900254363 Store
Defendant
Shop910331267 Store
Defendant
Shop910339248 Store
Defendant
Shop910347374 Store
Defendant
Shop910354282 Store
Defendant
Shop910354369 Store
Defendant
Shop911014067 Store
Defendant
Suson
Defendant
Suzhou Gardenia Co., Ltd
Defendant
TAKDE
Defendant
Tokfavory
Defendant
URANGEL
Defendant
Uniceworld
Defendant
Victor Valentine
Defendant
WSFDESEFDF
Defendant
YCSMH
Defendant
YEEZHOU-US
Defendant
Ye-Z
Defendant
Yi-gog
Defendant
Yizeda
Represented By
Shengmao Mu
Whitewood Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
YoursMagic
Defendant
Yuan Backdrop Store
Defendant
ZRNCNFFDC
Defendant
ZentaiZone Store
Defendant
adbgdzfh
Defendant
austin Store
Defendant
banhu Store
Defendant
bjgda
Defendant
dbzop Store
Defendant
dreamlives716
Defendant
ghfdjxfghnsgfh
Defendant
guangzhouyufengshannvIbh.
Defendant
ljwyyp
Defendant
mcpitee271
Defendant
netyakala Store
Defendant
peppa01 Store
Defendant
rc-toy_drone-store
Defendant
sdy518
Defendant
sherpaa
Defendant
shinechi
Defendant
sxtl88
Defendant
tangbaojieaw_8
Defendant
wonderfuljiahe
Defendant
wuhutongtongshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
xuzhiwei9331
Defendant
yangjiangshijiangchengquxidutaocidian
Defendant
yunchengwanli
Defendant
zhangxiuqing9652214
Defendant
zhengzhouyang
Defendant
zhenzhenma
Plaintiff
Entertainment One UK Ltd.
Represented By
Justin R. Gaudio
Greer Burns & Crain Ltd
contact info
Amy Crout Ziegler
Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.
contact info
Isaku Begert
Greer, Burns And Crain, Ltd.
contact info
Jake Michael Christensen
Greer, Burns & Crain
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cake Decoration
Terminated: 04/02/2021
Represented By
Tianyu Ju
Glacier Law PLLC
contact info
Tao Liu
Glacier Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/02/2021 12:13 AM CST
Monday, November 23, 2020
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Entertainment One UK Ltd.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17672080.(Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
2 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. Schedule A regarding complaint1 (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
4 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake)
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Isaku Begert (Begert, Isaku)
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
10 10 18 pgs MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of motion for temporary restraining order9 (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
11 11 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion10 (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
12 12 DECLARATION of Niall Trainor regarding memorandum in support of motion10 (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
13 13 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. Exhibit 3 - Parts 1-6 regarding declaration12(Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 3-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 3-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3-4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3-5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3-6
14 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
15 15 5 pgs MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief14 (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
16 16 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion15 (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
17 17 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order9 , motion for miscellaneous relief14 , motion for leave to file3 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/1/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Entertainment One UK Ltd. (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
19 19 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Entertainment One UK Ltd. (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]