UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 1.839 ACRES OFLAND, MORE OR LESS et al
Texas Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Micaela Alvarez |
Case #: | 7:20-cv-00380 |
Nature of Suit | 210 Real Property - Land Condemnation |
Cause | 28:1358 Land Condemnation |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday May 22, 2021 3:45 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ruben Noe Trevino, Jr.
Heir of Hilda R. Trevino/Ruben N. Trevino P.O. Box 173
Encino, TX 78353 |
|
Defendant
1.839 ACRES OFLAND, MORE OR LESS
|
|
Defendant
Miguel Jaime Rodriguez
Heir of Elma E. Rodriguez/Ambrosio Escalante 6824 Chase Street
North Richland Hills, TX 76182 |
|
Defendant
Venancio G. Rodriguez, III
Heir of Elma E. Rodriguez/Ambrosio Escalante 638 Cemetary Rd.
Decatur, TX 76234 |
|
Defendant
Ben Guadalupe Rodriguez, Jr.
Heir of Elma E. Rodriguez/Ambrosio Escalante 6800 E. FM 916
Grandview, TX 76050 |
|
Defendant
Ameida Salinas
Starr County Tax Assessor-Collector 100 N. FM 3167, Room 201
RIO GRANDE CITY, TX 75882 |
|
Defendant
Arcadio Salinas
|
|
Defendant
Gloria Trevino Juarez
Devisee of Saul Trevino, Sr. 13950 Rector Loop
Manor, TX 78653 |
|
Defendant
Catarina Perez Rose
Heir of Reynaldo Perez, Jr./Elida T. Perez 8630 Fairhaven St., Apt. 1401
San Antonio, TX 78229 |
|
Defendant
Floridor Zamora
P.O. Box 13
La Grulla, TX 78548 |
|
Defendant
Hector Cantu, Jr
|
|
Defendant
Dora Lynn Garcia
|
|
Defendant
Nori A Garcia
|
|
Defendant
Krystal N Hinojosa
|
|
Defendant
Olga Lee Lara
|
|
Defendant
Bryan Lopez
|
|
Defendant
Romero Morales
Heir of Elva Perez Morales/Elida T. Perez 559 S. Business Hwy 281
Encino, TX 78353 |
|
Defendant
Ernestina E. Bazan
Heir of Ambrosio Escalante/Lydia T. Escalante P.O. Box 133
Port O' Connor, TX 77982 |
|
Defendant
Linda Carmen Charles
Heir of Elma E. Rodriguez/Ambrosio Escalante 607 Beeman Dr.
Arlington, TX 76002 |
|
Defendant
Ovidio Escalante
Heir of Ambrosio Escalante/Lydia T. Escalante 4606 E. North Street
Victoria, TX 77901 |
|
Defendant
Viola Gloria Escalante Canales
Heir of Ambrosio Escalante/Lydia T. Escalante P.O. Box 171
Tivoli, TX 77990 |
|
Defendant
Mary Rose Escalante Rivera
Heir of Ambrosio Escalante/Lydia T. Escalante 5327 State Hwy 238
Port Lavaca, TX 77970 |
|
Defendant
Isidro Morales
Heir of Elva Perez Morales/Elida T. Perez 422B County Rd 205
Falfurrias, TX 78355 |
|
Defendant
Rene Morales
Heir of Elva Perez Morales/Elida T. Perez 1900 Zenaida Ave.
McAllen, TX 78504 |
|
Defendant
Sylvia Morales Garza
Heir of Elva Perez Morales/Elida T. Perez 933 County Road 203
Falfurrias, TX 78355 |
|
Defendant
Reynaldo Perez, III
Heir of Reynaldo Perez, Jr./Elida T. Perez 119 County Road 312
Encino, TX 78353 |
|
Defendant
Roel Perez
Heir of Elida T. Perez 541 S. Business Hwy 281
Encino, TX 78353 |
|
Defendant
Thelma R. Perez
3009 Landford Rd.
Mission, TX 78574 |
|
Defendant
Claudia Perez Cummings
Heir of Reynaldo Perez, Jr./Elida T. Perez 9518 Dunhill
San Antonio, TX 78239 |
|
Defendant
Rosario Perez Lewis
Heir of Reynaldo Perez, Jr./Elida T. Perez 4351 Boblett Rd.
Blaine, WA 98230 |
|
Defendant
Laura Perez McGee
Heir of Reynaldo Perez, Jr./Elida T. Perez 5451 FM 1794 E
De Berry, TX 75639 |
|
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Olga Trevino Cantu
Terminated: 04/27/2021
Devisee of Saul Trevino, Sr. P.O. Box 49
Encino, TX 78353 |
|
Defendant
Noelia Trevino Herrera
Terminated: 01/21/2021
Heir of Hilda R. Trevino/Ruben N. Trevino 1014 FM 755
Encino, TX 78353 |
|
Defendant
Saul Trevino, Jr.
Terminated: 01/21/2021
Devisee of Saul Trevino, Sr. 1089 FM 755
Encino, TX 78353 |
|
Defendant
Maria Nelda Villarreal
Terminated: 03/22/2021
Heir of Elva Perez Morales/Elida T. Perez 205 FM 1538
Falfurria, TX 78355 |
|
Defendant
Homer Escalante
Terminated: 01/21/2021
Heir of Ambrosio Escalante/Lydia T. Escalante 4366 FM 236
Victoria, TX 77905 |
|
Defendant
Sonia Perez Nunnery
Terminated: 01/21/2021
Heir of Reynaldo Perez, Jr./Elida T. Perez 4059 Sims Rd.
Mooringsport, LA 71060 |
|
Defendant
Eliza Perez
Terminated: 03/22/2021
Heir of Reynaldo Perez, Jr./Elida T. Perez 5451 FM 1794 E
De Berry, TX 75639 |
|
Defendant
Magdalena Perez Craig
Terminated: 03/22/2021
Heir of Reynaldo Perez, Jr./ Elida T. Perez 303 Great Bluoak
San Antonio, TX 78260 |