Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Timothy D Degiusti
Case #: 5:20-cv-01189
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 24, 2020
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Sunday May 23, 2021 6:09 AM CDT
Defendant
Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Represented By
Matthew C Kane
Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber PLLC
contact info
Gerard F Pignato
Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber PLLC
contact info
Chance L Pearson
Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber PLLC
contact info
Defendant
HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By
Matthew C Kane
Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber PLLC
contact info
Gerard F Pignato
Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber PLLC
contact info
Chance L Pearson
Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hotels-PRSM LLC
Represented By
Andrew C Jayne
Baum Glass Jayne & Carwile PLLC
contact info
Edwin T Lipscomb
Loree & Lipscomb
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 16, 2022
37 37 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/16 4:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by All Defendants. (Pearson, Chance)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
36 36 order Administrative Closing Order Thu 07/28 4:25 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 60 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/28/2022. (mb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings Fri 06/03 4:26 PM
ORDER granting34 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines Discovery due by 9/3/2022. Expert Witness List due by 8/2/2022. Motions due by 8/5/2022. Pretrial Report due by 10/1/2022.. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/3/2022. (mb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
34 34 motion Extend Deadlines or Hearings Wed 06/01 4:35 PM
JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines or Hearings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Pearson, Chance)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
33 33 trial Exhibit List Fri 05/20 2:31 PM
Exhibit List by Plaintiff Hotels-PRSM LLC. (Lipscomb, Edwin)
Related: [-]
32 32 trial Witness List Fri 05/20 2:16 PM
Witness List by Plaintiff Hotels-PRSM LLC. (Lipscomb, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
31 31 trial Witness List - Expert Thu 04/28 10:12 AM
Expert Witness List by Plaintiff Hotels-PRSM LLC. (Lipscomb, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
30 30 trial Witness List - Expert Wed 04/20 3:22 PM
Expert Witness List by Defendants Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Pignato, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings Mon 03/21 3:08 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings Discovery due by 7/5/2022. Exhibit List due by 5/20/2022. Motions due by 6/6/2022. Pretrial Report due by 8/2/2022.. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/21/2022. (mb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Hearings Thu 04/07 9:30 AM
Jury Trial terminated (mb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
28 28 motion Extend Deadlines or Hearings Thu 03/17 4:02 PM
JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines or Hearings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Pearson, Chance)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
27 27 trial Witness List - Expert Mon 03/07 4:32 PM
Expert Witness List by Plaintiff Hotels-PRSM LLC. (Lipscomb, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings Thu 01/06 4:12 PM
ORDER granting25 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/3/2022. Exhibit List due by 3/21/2022. Expert Witness List due by 3/7/2022. Motions due by 4/5/2022. Pretrial Report due by 6/3/2022.. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/6/2022. (mb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
25 25 motion Extend Deadlines or Hearings Wed 01/05 2:31 PM
JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines or Hearings by Hotels-PRSM LLC. (Lipscomb, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
24 24 order Protective Order Wed 11/03 4:15 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/3/2021. (mb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
23 23 motion Protective Order Tue 11/02 1:39 PM
JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by All Defendants.(Pearson, Chance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order
Thursday, June 17, 2021
22 22 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Thu 06/17 12:14 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London . (Pearson, Chance)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Thu 06/17 12:10 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by HDI Global Specialty SE . (Pearson, Chance)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
20 20 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Wed 06/09 4:08 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Hotels-PRSM LLC . (Lipscomb, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
19 19 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/02 12:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 14 days; Motions to amend due 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 1/4/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 1/18/2022; Pla witness list due 1/18/2022; Pla exhibit list due 1/18/2022; Motions in limine due 4/4/2022; Jury instructions due 4/4/2022; Voir dire requests due 4/4/2022; Discovery due by 3/4/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 2/4/2022. Pretrial Report due by 4/4/2022. Corporate Disclosure Statements due within 7 days. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/2/2021. (mb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
18 18 misc Joint Status Report Fri 05/28 2:01 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Hotels-PRSM LLC. (Lipscomb, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
17 17 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/24 1:38 PM
ORDER: Unless the Court directs otherwise, the case Scheduling Order will be issued based on the parties Joint Status Report. Should the Court decide that a scheduling conference is necessary, the conference will be conducted telephonically, pursuant to the Courts Chambers Rules located on the Courts website. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/24/2021. (mb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
16 16 misc Docket Wed 05/12 1:37 PM
DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2021 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 6/1/2021. (mb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
15 15 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 04/20 3:01 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Chance L Pearson on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE (Pearson, Chance)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Tue 04/13 3:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE.(Pignato, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
13 13 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 04/09 3:09 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew C Kane on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE (Kane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 04/09 3:04 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Gerard F Pignato on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE (Pignato, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/01 11:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hotels-PRSM LLC. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London served on 3/25/2021. (Lipscomb, Edwin)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/01 11:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hotels-PRSM LLC. HDI Global Specialty SE served on 3/25/2021. (Lipscomb, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
9 9 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/22 4:32 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff an additional 30 days from the date of this Order in which to perfect service upon Defendants re8 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Hotels-PRSM LLC. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/22/2021. (mb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
8 8 respm Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 03/17 10:35 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Hotels-PRSM LLC. (Lipscomb, Edwin)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 03/17 9:30 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 03/15 4:20 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Edwin T Lipscomb on behalf of Hotels-PRSM LLC (Lipscomb, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 03/09 9:28 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 3/19/2021.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/9/2021. (mb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/30 4:27 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edwin Todd Lipscomb. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/30/2020. (mb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 27, 2020
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Fri 11/27 9:59 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3410092 by Hotels-PRSM LLC.(Jayne, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Request Admit PHV - Lipscomb
2 2 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 11/27 9:55 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew C Jayne on behalf of Hotels-PRSM LLC (Jayne, Andrew)
Related: [-]
misc Payment for a Civil Case Fri 11/27 9:24 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3410087. (Jayne, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/24 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE filed by Hotels-PRSM LLC.(kmt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet