Arizona District Court
Judge:Susan R Bolton
Case #: 2:20-cv-02280
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Nov 24, 2020
Terminated:Jul 26, 2021
Last checked: Sunday May 23, 2021 1:28 AM MST
Defendant
CopperPoint Insurance Company
Represented By
Carrie Marie Francis
Stinson Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Arizinnia Hood
Represented By
Bernard R Mazaheri
Mazaheri & Mazaheri - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, July 26, 2021
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 07/26 11:08 AM
ORDER - On June 22, 2021, upon receipt of a Notice of Settlement, this Court issued an order that this case would be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of the order if a stipulation to dismiss was not filed prior to the dismissal date. As of the date of this order, no stipulation to dismiss has been filed. IT IS ORDERED dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/26/2021. (WLP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 06/22 9:57 AM
ORDER: Defendant having filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc.17 ); IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this Order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the pretrial deadlines; the pretrial conference and the trial date. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/22/21. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 06/21 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by CopperPoint Insurance Company. (Brady, Clarissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of Deposition Mon 06/07 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Arizianna Hood, filed by CopperPoint Insurance Company. (Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 03/25 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CopperPoint Insurance Company. (Brady, Clarissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 02/26 7:58 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizinnia Hood. (Mazaheri, Bernard)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/26 4:14 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 7/9/2021. Dispositive motions due by 11/19/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/2/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 502, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 502, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/26/2021. (LMR) Modified to correct docket text on 2/26/2021 (LMR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
12 12 minutes Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Thu 02/25 4:25 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton: At the time set for Scheduling Conference on 2/25/2021, Plaintiff's counsel is not present. Court reconvenes with all counsel present and Scheduling Conference is held. Deadlines are discussed as stated on the record. Separate order to issue. APPEARANCES: Bernard Mazaheri (telephonically) for Plaintiff. Carrie Francis (telephonically) for Defendant. (Court Reporter Hilda Lopez.) Hearing held 1:31 PM to 2:25 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 02/23 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CopperPoint Insurance Company. (Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
10 10 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Thu 02/18 5:28 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Arizinnia Hood. (Mazaheri, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
9 9 order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 02/10 3:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER: On the Court's own Motion, Telephonic Scheduling Conference is re-set IN TIME ONLY from 11:15 AM to 01:30 PM on 2/25/2021 before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
8 8 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 01/26 11:09 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for February 25, 2021, at 11:15 a.m. The Rule 16 Case Management Conference will be telephonic. Counsel shall not appear in person. Counsel are directed to call (866) 390-1828; Access code 9667260 five minutes prior to the hearing. Counsel are advised that speaker phones are not permitted [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/26/21. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/25 10:28 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CopperPoint Insurance Company. (Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/25 10:25 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CopperPoint Insurance Company.(Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/21 1:29 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P., that this action shall be dismissed without further notice after February 22, 2021, unless before then Plaintiff has served Defendant with the summons and complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/21/21. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 11/24 4:02 PM
Summons Issued as to CopperPoint Insurance Company. (DLC)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 11/24 4:00 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18915049. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 20-2280 PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Tue 11/24 3:58 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Arizinnia Hood. (Mazaheri, Bernard) (DLC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/24 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18915049 filed by Arizinnia Hood. (Mazaheri, Bernard)(DLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet