Nevada District Court
Case #: 2:20-mj-01005
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 24, 2020 11:26 PM PST
Defendant
Zachary P. Cassita (1)
Represented By
Cristen Thayer
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 11/24/2020 11:34 PM PST
Monday, November 23, 2020
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DCh)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Zachary P. Cassita. FPD appointed as counsel for Defendant. Subpoenas issued upon request, with exception to out-of-state subpoenas which will require court approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings as to Zachary P. Cassita. (MR)
Related: [-]