Brown v. Weber
Original Case: 7:18-cv-09618
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03929 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 04, 2021 5:34 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Terence Weber
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Stevens Transport, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Rasha Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lloyd Watson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/04/2021 4:29 AM EST |
Friday, November 20, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Rasha Brown and Lloyd Watson, FILED. [2980154] 20-3929 [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:22 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Rasha Brown and Lloyd Watson, district court receipt # ANYSDC-22681081, FILED.[2980159] 20-3929 [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:30 PM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/26/2020, RECEIVED.[2980161] 20-3929 [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:31 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2980162] 20-3929 [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:31 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |