California Central District Court
Case #: 2:20-cv-10743
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:0001 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2020
Terminated:Dec 04, 2020
Last checked: Monday May 31, 2021 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Advanced Air, LLC
Defendant
City of Hawthorne
Defendant
Hawthorne Airport, LLC
Defendant
Levi Stockton
Defendant
David Wehrly
Plaintiff
Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.
Plaintiff
Dan Wolfe


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, December 04, 2020
2 2 utility Terminate Attorney Civil Case Opening - optional html form Fri 12/04 6:03 AM
In response to the opening of this case, the Clerk issued a Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Attorney Case Opening. The Notice indicated that unless counsel corrected the identified discrepancy within two business days, the docket for this case number would be closed and no further filings would be permitted under this case number. Counsel has not corrected the discrepancy. Accordingly, this case is now closed. No further filings may be made under this case number, except, if applicable, to request a refund of fees using a Form G-124, Application for Refund of Fees. Should you wish to pursue this action, a new case must be filed and a new case number issued. (Case Terminated) (esa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
1 1 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 12/02 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. (esa)
Related: [-]