Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12822

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy V Alquist
Case #: 1:20-ap-00358
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Nov 24, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Diane Resnick
7843 Valencia Drive
Boca Raton, FL 33433
Represented By
Diane Resnick
contact info
Defendant
American Express Company
28 Liberty St.
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
American Express Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Zvi Guttman
Miles & Stockbridge, P.C. 100 Light Street
Baltimore, MD 21202
Represented By
Emily Devan
Miles & Stockbridge P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, April 19, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/19 10:04 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-358 Closed. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 04/16 11:49 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding of American Express Company Filed by Zvi Guttman. (Jefferson, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/15 4:53 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Diane Resnick Filed by Zvi Guttman. (Jefferson, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
6 6 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Crossclaim Fri 01/22 11:01 AM
Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by American Express Company against Diane Resnick Filed by American Express Company. (Lichtenstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 apmisc Line Fri 01/22 11:00 AM
Line /Defendant American Express Company's Corporate Disclosure Statement Filed by Michael J. Lichtenstein. (Lichtenstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Thu 12/03 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/02/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
3 3 misc Affidavit Tue 12/01 10:35 AM
Affidavit Re: Service of Complaint and Summons upon Defendants Filed by Emily Devan Related [+]. (Devan, Emily)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman,2 Summons Issued
Monday, November 30, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/30 9:11 AM
Summons Issued on American Express Company and Diane Resnick; Date Issued 11/30/2020, Answer Due 12/30/2020 RE:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman; Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 01:00 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Alexander, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Tue 11/24 3:07 PM
Adversary case 20-00358 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Emily Devan on behalf of Zvi Guttman against Diane Resnick, American Express Company. The filing fee is DEFERRED - Plaintiff is the Trustee in the Bankruptcy case and will pay the fee to the extent that there is an estate. (Devan, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C