California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:20-cv-08324
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2020
Terminated:Dec 27, 2021
Last checked: Monday May 24, 2021 3:26 AM PDT
Defendant
LinkedIn Corporation
Represented By
David Jason Silbert
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Michelle Sabrina Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Morgan Elizabeth Sharma
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Luke P. Apfeld
Keker, Van Nest And Peters LLP
contact info
Franco Emilio Muzzio
Keker, Van Nest And Peters LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Noirefy, Inc
Represented By
David Adam Neiman
Romanucci And Blandin LLC
contact info
Warren D. Postman
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Jason W Ethridge
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
James Dominick Larry
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Brooke Clason Smith
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Keith Custis
Custis Law, P.C.
contact info
Bryce Thomas Hensley
Romanucci And Blandin, LLC
contact info
Antonio M. Romanucci
Romanucci And Blandin, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TopDevz, LLC
Represented By
David Adam Neiman
Romanucci And Blandin LLC
contact info
Warren D. Postman
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Jason W Ethridge
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
James Dominick Larry
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Brooke Clason Smith
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Keith Custis
Custis Law, P.C.
contact info
Bryce Thomas Hensley
Romanucci And Blandin, LLC
contact info
Antonio M. Romanucci
Romanucci And Blandin, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SYNERGY RX PBM LLC
Represented By
Joshua Fruchter
Wohl Fruchter LLP
contact info
Ari Yale Basser
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
James Dominick Larry
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Jordan L. Lurie
Pomerantz LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 29 2021
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 30 31 32 APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/29/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
GPO Apr 23 2021
ORDER denying 53 Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Class Counsel. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/23/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
GPO May 05 2021
ORDER RE 70 JOINT ESI PROTOCOL DISPUTE LETTER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/5/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
GPO Aug 03 2021
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Dismiss; denying 66 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/3/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
GPO Aug 04 2021
Order re 81 Joint Discovery Dispute Submission. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/4/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
GPO Dec 27 2022
ORDER ON 97 MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/27/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
127 127 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/05 10:29 AM
MOTION Withdrawal of David Neiman as Attorney filed by TopDevz, LLC, Noirefy, Inc. Responses due by 2/19/2025. Replies due by 2/26/2025. (Neiman, David)
Related: [-]