National Association of the, et al v. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., et al
Original Case: 1:20-cv-02107
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cvus-05349 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 25, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 23, 2021 7:02 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Executive Office of the President
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
White House Office
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Office of the Vice President
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Kayleigh Mcenany, in her official capacity as Press Secretary to the President of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Joseph R. Biden, Jr., in his official capacity as President of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Jennifer Psaki, in her official capacity as Press Secretary to the President of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
National Association of the Deaf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Graham Forsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Carlton Strail
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Debra Fleetwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
John Rivera, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Corey Axelrod
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/23/2021 7:02 AM EDT |
Wednesday, November 25, 2020 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 20-5349 | ||
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1873257] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-02107-JEB filed by Executive Office of the President, Kayleigh Mcenany, Office of the Vice President, Donald J. Trump and White House Office. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5349 20-5349 | ||
1 pgs ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1873276] filed by Daniel Winik and co-counsel Charles W. Scarborough on behalf of Appellants Donald J. Trump, Executive Office of the President, Office of the Vice President, White House Office and Kayleigh Mcenany. 20-5349 (Winik, Daniel) |