Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Big Apple Med Equipment, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Referred: | James R Cho |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-05786 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday May 29, 2021 7:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
David Abayev
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Big Apple Med Equipment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Aleksandr Mostovoy, D.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Suresh Paulus, D.O.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEICO Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEICO General Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEICO Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Government Employees Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Ashley Kiaei, D.C.
Terminated: 03/14/2021
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peter Margulies, D.C.
Terminated: 05/05/2021
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
61 | 61
misc
Letter
Thu 07/22 9:41 AM
Letter to Judge Chen, re John Doe Defendants 1-10 by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Vanunu, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Against John Doe Defendants 1-10 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 07/22 7:55 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The [61-1] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of all claims against John Doe Defendants 1-10, the only Defendants remaining in this case, is So Ordered. The case is terminated. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/22/2021. (Irving, Louisa) |
||
Monday, July 19, 2021 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Mon 07/19 8:11 PM
Order Dismissing Party: The60 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Suresh Paulus, D.O., is So Ordered. Plaintiff shall inform the Court how it wishes to proceed as against defendant John Does 1-10 by July 22, 2021. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/19/2021. (Irving, Louisa) |
||
Friday, July 16, 2021 | ||
60 | 60
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/16 10:53 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice against Defendant Suresh Paulus, D.O. by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Levy, Barry) |