Washington Western District Court
Judge:Robert S Lasnik
Case #: 2:20-cv-01764
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2020
Terminated:Dec 07, 2020
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 20-00002-16271-0 SEA
Last checked: Saturday May 29, 2021 3:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Merchants Credit Corporation
Represented By
Marc Rosenberg
Lee Smart Ps Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela D Carlyle
Represented By
Boris Davidovskiy
Boris Davidovskiy, P.S.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 07, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 12/07 10:29 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It is hereby ordered that all claims set forth in Plaintiff's Complaint are dismissed with prejudice, and the case is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety, with each party bearing their own costs. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
5 5 motion Dismiss Fri 12/04 10:42 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice , filed by Defendant Merchants Credit Corporation. Noting Date 12/4/2020, (Rosenberg, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
4 4 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/01 10:52 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Merchants Credit Corporation (Rosenberg, Marc)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Tue 12/01 10:13 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/01 10:11 AM
Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (CDA)
Related: [-]
utility Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Tue 12/01 10:14 AM
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/8/2020. (CDA)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
2 2 notice Notice-Other Mon 11/30 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Filing in State Court re1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Merchants Credit Corporation. (Rosenberg, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 11/30 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20 2-16271 0 SEA; Related [+] Attorney Marc Rosenberg added to party Merchants Credit Corporation(pty:dft), filed by Merchants Credit Corporation.(Rosenberg, Marc)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-6771842
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet