Original Case: 4:20-cv-04827

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-17316
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2020
Terminated:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 01, 2020 12:25 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By
Kenneth John Holloway
State Bar of California
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CALIFORNIA COMMITTEE OF BAR EXAMINERS, and Their Agents in Their Official Capacity
Represented By
Kenneth John Holloway
State Bar of California
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BENJAMIN KOHN
Represented By
Benjamin Kohn
contact info

GPO Dec 06 2023
FILED OPINION (MARY H. MURGUIA, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON, SANDRA S. IKUTA, JOHN B. OWENS, DANIEL A. BRESS, DANIELLE J. FORREST, PATRICK J. BUMATAY, JENNIFER SUNG, GABRIEL P. SANCHEZ, HOLLY A. THOMAS and SALVADOR MENDOZA, JR.) AFFIRMED IN PART and REMANDED to the three-judge panel. Opinion by Judge Owens; Partial Concurrence by Judge Mendoza; Partial Concurrence and Partial Dissent by Judge Bumatay. [12833681]
GPO Oct 21 2024
FILED OPINION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN) The district court???s dismissal of Kohn???s Title II claims is vacated. We remand the suit for further proceedings. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. Judge: KMW Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [12911619]

Docket last updated: 10/22/2024 8:32 AM PDT
Friday, November 27, 2020
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Benjamin Kohn opening brief due 01/27/2021. Appellees California Committee of Bar Examiners and State Bar of California answering brief due 03/01/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11907596] (RT) [Entered: 11/27/2020 10:15 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing
Att: 4 55 pgs Case Opening Packet