Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-11739

Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Case #: 1:20-ap-01022
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2020
Terminated:Jan 25, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Houn Le
Chapter 13 Trustee P O Box 2127
Augusta, GA 30903
Represented By
Houn Le
contact info
Defendant
Capital One Auto Finance
P O Box 165028
Irving, TX 75016
Represented By
Capital One Auto Finance
contact info
Defendant
Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By
Geico General Insurance Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexis Mechelle Larsuel
3746 Pine Ridge Run
Augusta, GA 30907
Represented By
Kathryn A. Brow Aho
Duncan & Brow Attorneys At Law, Lllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Chenise C Dillard
3746 Pine Ridge Run
Augusta, GA 30907
Represented By
Kathryn A. Brow Aho
Duncan & Brow Attorneys At Law, Lllp
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
46 46 court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/25 9:21 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1022 Closed (BJG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
45 45 misc Amendment Fri 01/21 3:04 PM
Amendment Filed by Kathryn A. Brow Aho on behalf of Chenise C Dillard, Alexis Mechelle Larsuel Related [+] (Brow Aho, Kathryn)
Related: [-] 42 ,43
Friday, January 14, 2022
44 44 notice Defective Pleading Fri 01/14 4:16 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or before: 1/21/2022. (VWW)
Related: [-] 42 ,43
Monday, November 01, 2021
43 43 misc Amendment Mon 11/01 11:11 AM
Amendment Filed by Kathryn A. Brow Aho on behalf of Chenise C Dillard, Alexis Mechelle Larsuel Related [+] (Brow Aho, Kathryn)
Related: [-] 42
Friday, October 22, 2021
42 42 misc Stipulation Fri 10/22 5:20 PM
Stipulation By Alexis Mechelle Larsuel and the Office of the Chapter 13 Trustee and Capital One Auto Finance Dismissing the Case with Prejudice . Filed by Kathryn A. Brow Aho on behalf of Alexis Mechelle Larsuel (Brow Aho, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
41 41 misc Proposed Order with Certificate of Service Thu 07/08 5:35 PM
Entered in Error , Proposed has been docketed in the underlying Case 16-11739 Proposed Order with Certificate of Service Filed by Kathryn A. Brow Aho on behalf of Chenise C Dillard, Alexis Mechelle Larsuel Related [+] (Brow Aho, Kathryn) Modified on 7/9/2021 (BJG)
Related: [-] 40
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
40 40 motion Compensation Wed 06/23 4:14 PM
Application for Compensation for Kathryn A. Brow Aho, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to, Fee: $2693.90, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney Kathryn A. Brow Aho. (Brow Aho, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/01 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
38 38 order Default Judgment (order) Wed 04/28 3:08 PM
Order Denying Motion for Default Judgment as to GEICO. Further ORDERED that GEICO is not entitled to disbursement of any of the insurance proceeds it previously remitted to the Chapter 13 Trustee. Related [+] Filed on 4/28/2021. (BJG) Modified on 4/28/2021 to add additional language to docket text (BJG)
Related: [-] 23
Monday, March 29, 2021
37 37 court Hearing Held Mon 03/29 4:20 PM
Hearing Held on 3/29/2021 on Trial on Damages as to GEICO only, Amended Motion to Amend Answer to Complaint filed by Capital One Auto Finance - DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS. Related [+] (AKG)
Related: [-] 24 ,32
Friday, March 19, 2021
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/20 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 03/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34
Thursday, March 18, 2021
35 35 notice Requirement to File Rule 26(f) Report Thu 03/18 8:40 AM
Notice of Requirement to File Rule 26(f) Report Related [+]. Report due by: 4/1/2021. (BJG)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
34 34 court Hearing (AP - all types) Wed 03/17 9:38 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 3/29/2021 at 10:00 AM at (BY TELEPHONE). (BJG)
Related: [-] 23 ,28 ,32
Thursday, March 11, 2021
32 32 motion Amended Motion Thu 03/11 9:47 AM
Amended Motion to Amend Answer, with proposed Order and certificate of service Filed by Craig B. Lefkoff on behalf of Capital One Auto Finance. Related [+] (Lefkoff, Craig)
Related: [-] 28
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
31 31 misc Proposed Order with Certificate of Service Tue 03/09 4:33 PM
Proposed Order with Certificate of Service Filed by Craig B. Lefkoff on behalf of Capital One Auto Finance Related [+] (Lefkoff, Craig)
Related: [-] 28 , 30
30 30 court Deficiency Notice (RE: Proposed Order) Tue 03/09 1:47 PM
(Text Only) Deficiency Notice to Craig Lefkoff RE: Failure to File and Upload a Proposed Order in eOrder Format. Pursuant to General Order 2016-2, Proposed Orders shall be submitted in an eOrder format, filed in CM/ECF with a certificate of service, and also uploaded in the eOrder module. Please use the following event to file your proposed order: Adversary or Bankruptcy > Miscellaneous > Proposed Order with Certificate of Service. Then, upload your order via the eOrders module using the event under Adversary or Bankruptcy > Order Upload. Related [+]. Order due by 3/16/2021, or the matter may be stricken, dismissed or denied. (BJG)
Related: [-] 28
Monday, March 08, 2021
28 28 motion motion generic Mon 03/08 1:10 PM
*** Motion to Amend Answer to Complaint Filed by Craig B. Lefkoff on behalf of Capital One Auto Finance. (Lefkoff, Craig)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 06, 2021
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/07 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 03/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24
Thursday, March 04, 2021
24 24 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 03/04 1:34 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] (BJG)
Related: [-] 23
Thursday, February 25, 2021
22 22 court Hearing Held Thu 02/25 1:10 PM
Hearing Held on 2/25/2021 on Show Cause for failure to prosecute - DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS. Related [+] (CMT)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
23 23 motion Default Judgment Fri 02/26 2:54 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to GEICO, Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Kathryn A. Brow Aho on behalf of GEICO . Related [+] (BJG)
Related: [-] 1
21 21 motion Entry of Default Wed 02/24 2:07 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to GEICO Filed by Kathryn A. Brow Aho on behalf of Chenise C Dillard, Alexis Mechelle Larsuel. (Brow Aho, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
33 33 court Returned Mail Notice (BNC) Thu 03/11 1:12 PM
Returned Mail Notice for GEICO. Attorney for Plaintiff should supply the Court with a correct address. Related [+] (BJG)
Related: [-] 18
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/13 12:51 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 02/12/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
19 19 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Fri 02/12 9:26 AM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Huon Le on behalf of Office of the Chapter 13 Trustee Related [+] (Le, Huon)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
18 18 court Hearing (AP - all types) Wed 02/10 5:01 PM
Notice of Show Cause Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 2/25/2021 at 09:00 AM at (BY TELEPHONE). (BJG)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, February 05, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/06 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/05/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
16 16 notice Defective Pleading (Case Mgr use only) Wed 02/03 3:33 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or Before: 2/10/2021. (BJG)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
15 15 misc Notice of Change of Address Wed 12/30 3:54 PM
Notice of Change of Address for Alexis Mechelle Larsuel and Chenise C. Dillard Filed by Kathryn A. Brow Aho on behalf of Chenise C Dillard, Alexis Mechelle Larsuel (Brow Aho, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Wed 12/23 4:02 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Philip L. Rubin on behalf of Capital One Auto Finance Related [+] (Rubin, Philip)
Related: [-] 8 ,9 ,13
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/23 3:59 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint with certificate of Service Filed by Capital One Auto Finance. (Rubin, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
12 12 answer Response Tue 12/22 10:35 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Defendant Office of the Chapter 13 Trustee (Le, Huon)
Related: [-] 1 filed by Plaintiff Alexis Mechelle Larsuel, Plaintiff Chenise C Dillard
Friday, December 11, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/12 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/11/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/09 5:10 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Kathryn A. Brow Aho on behalf of Chenise C Dillard, Alexis Mechelle Larsuel Related [+] (Brow Aho, Kathryn)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
9 9 notice Defective Pleading (Case Mgr use only) Wed 12/09 10:56 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or Before: 12/16/2020. (BJG)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
8 8 answer Response Tue 12/08 9:13 PM
Response to Related [+] and Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Capital One Auto Finance (Rubin, Philip)
Related: [-] 1 filed by Plaintiff Alexis Mechelle Larsuel, Plaintiff Chenise C Dillard
Friday, December 04, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/05 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/05 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/05 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/05 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued/Reissued Wed 12/02 4:21 PM
Summons and Notice Requiring Rule 26(f) Report. (BJG)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Wed 12/02 3:31 PM
Judge Susan D. Barrett added to case (BJG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Tue 12/01 12:18 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Kathryn A. Brow Aho on behalf of Chenise C Dillard, Alexis Mechelle Larsuel (Brow Aho, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/01 12:15 PM
Adversary case 20-01022 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)): Complaint by Kathryn A. Brow Aho on behalf of Alexis Mechelle Larsuel, Chenise C Dillard against Houn Le, Capital One Auto Finance, Geico General Insurance Company. Receipt Number Except, Fee Amount $350 (Brow Aho, Kathryn)
Related: [-]