Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-44277

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Bonnie L Clair
Case #: 4:20-ap-04086
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2020
Terminated:Aug 03, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bradley A Dennigmann
3244 Domain St.
Saint Charles, MO 63301
Represented By
Bradley A Dennigmann
contact info
Defendant
Laura L Dennigmann
3244 Domain St.
Saint Charles, MO 63301
Represented By
Laura L Dennigmann
contact info
Plaintiff
CORNERSTONE CONSULTING, INC.
TRICORBRAUN, INC C/O CT CORPORATION 120 SOUTH CENTRAL
CLAYTON, MO 63105
Represented By
Peter A Corsale
Mccarthy Leonard & Kaemmerer, L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:08 PM CDT
Thursday, August 05, 2021
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 08/05 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 08/05/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 08/05 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 08/05/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
25 25 order Judgment Tue 08/03 11:20 AM
Judgment Related [+]. (pri, m)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Consulting Inc
24 24 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 08/03 11:14 AM
Agreed Order of Non-Dischargeability Related [+]. (pri, m)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Consulting Inc
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 08/03 11:23 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:20-ap-4086: Judgment for Plaintiff. (pri, m)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/03 11:24 AM
Adversary Case 4:20-ap-4086 Closed (pri, m)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
court Hearing Held Tue 06/15 3:56 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] - This matter is settled, orders to be submitted. (MatthewClear)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Cornerstone Consulting Inc
Thursday, June 10, 2021
23 23 misc Settlement Conference Report Thu 06/10 9:52 AM
Settlement Conference Report Filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Consulting Inc. (Corsale, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/07 5:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Consulting Inc. (Corsale, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
court Hearing Continued Tue 05/11 12:37 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 06/15/2021 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 South. (MatthewClear)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Cornerstone Consulting Inc
Friday, May 07, 2021
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/07 5:06 PM
Certificate of Service First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Filed by Defendant Bradley A Dennigmann. (Gunn, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/20 6:32 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Bradley A Dennigmann Related [+]. (Gunn, David)
Related: [-] 13 Amended Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt by Peter A Corsale on behalf of Cornerstone Consulting Inc against Bradley A Dennigmann. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit) filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Consulting Inc
Saturday, April 17, 2021
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/17 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 04/17/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, April 15, 2021
18 18 order Dismiss Party Thu 04/15 3:24 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Laura Dennigmann Re: Motion to Dismiss Party Related [+] (jer, j)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
17 17 motion Dismiss Party Wed 04/14 2:55 PM
Motion to Dismiss Laura Dennigmann Filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Consulting Inc (Corsale, Peter)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 28, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 03/28 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 03/28/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, March 26, 2021
15 15 order Extend Time Fri 03/26 8:16 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to file an answer to the amended complaint to 4/21/21. Related [+] (cro, d) Modified on 3/26/2021 (cro, d)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
14 14 motion Extend Time Wed 03/17 5:05 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by Defendants Bradley A Dennigmann, Laura L Dennigmann (Gunn, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
court Hearing Continued Tue 03/09 3:56 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 05/11/2021 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 South. (MatthewClear)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Cornerstone Consulting Inc
Monday, March 08, 2021
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/08 2:35 PM
Amended Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt by Peter A Corsale on behalf of Cornerstone Consulting Inc against Bradley A Dennigmann. (Corsale, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Saturday, February 27, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/27 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 02/27/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, February 25, 2021
11 11 order Generic Order Thu 02/25 11:13 AM
Order Granting Motion (10 Motion to Leave to File Amended Complaint to Determine Dischargeability filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Consulting Inc) Related [+]
Related: [-] i, k
Friday, February 12, 2021
10 10 motion Generic Motion Fri 02/12 9:11 AM
Motion to Leave to File Amended Complaint to Determine Dischargeability Filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Consulting Inc (Corsale, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 02/10 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 02/10/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
court Hearing Continued Tue 02/09 12:16 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 03/09/2021 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 South. (MatthewClear)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Cornerstone Consulting Inc
Monday, February 08, 2021
8 8 order Extend Time Mon 02/08 2:14 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to file answer to 3/5/21 Related [+] (cro, d)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
7 7 motion Extend Time Tue 02/02 1:26 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Filed by Defendants Bradley A Dennigmann, Laura L Dennigmann (Gunn, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 01/13 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 01/13/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
court Hearing Continued Tue 01/12 1:39 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled 02/09/2021 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 South. (MatthewClear)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Cornerstone Consulting Inc
Monday, January 11, 2021
5 5 order Extend Time Mon 01/11 7:53 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to file answer. Defendants to file an answer by 2/3/21. Related [+] (cro, d)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
4 4 motion Extend Time Tue 12/29 2:49 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Filed by Defendants Bradley A Dennigmann, Laura L Dennigmann (Gunn, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
3 3 court Summons and Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders Issued Wed 12/02 10:56 AM
Summons and Consent to Entry of Judgment and Orders Issued on Bradley A Dennigmann Date Issued 12/2/2020, Answer Due 1/4/2021; Laura L Dennigmann Date Issued 12/2/2020, Answer Due 1/4/2021 Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 South. (cle, m)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
2 2 crditcrd Internet Credit Card Receipt Tue 12/01 12:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 20-04086 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A17765014, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/01 12:01 PM
Adversary case 20-04086 Complaint by CORNERSTONE CONSULTING, INC. (attorney Peter A Corsale ) against Bradley A Dennigmann, Laura L Dennigmann Fee Amount $350.(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud))(Corsale, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Att: 3 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
court Case Assigned Tue 12/01 2:34 PM
Judge Bonnie L Clair added to case (cru, s)
Related: [-]