Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry E Hudson
Case #: 3:20-cv-00916
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2020
Terminated:Jan 26, 2022
Last checked: Sunday May 30, 2021 7:28 AM EDT
Defendant
GTO Drywall
Represented By
Matthew Edward Feinberg
Pilieromazza PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Capital Interior Contractors
Represented By
Jason Alexander Cabrera
Cozen O'Connor (pa-Na)
contact info
Nathaniel Lyle Story
Hirschler Fleischer PC
contact info
Courtney Moates Paulk
Hirschler Fleischer PC
contact info
George Andrew Voegele, Jr.
Cozen O'Connor (pa-Na)
contact info
Elizabeth Childress Burneson
Hirschler Fleischer PC
contact info
Defendant
RDIC Incorporated
Represented By
Matthew Edward Feinberg
Pilieromazza PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Javier Fernandez
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Miguel Villeda
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Alvin Garcia
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Franklin Rolando Morazan Isaguirre
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Chelston Juarez
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Peyton Rodriguez Lugo
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Josue Esteban Morales
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Heriberto Benitez Orellana
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Oscar Ortez-Nuila
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Abel Bartolon Ramos
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Cristian Romero
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Romero
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Yenyffer Romero
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
William Alexander Salgado
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Ramon Escalante
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Ramon Antonio Mejia Costello
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Jorge Colin-Garfias
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeronimo Chavez
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcos Cabrera
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Nolberto Bueso
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Manuel Brene
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Rogelio Antonio Benitez
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Anibal Bedoya
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Emer Samir Rodriguez Avila
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Azalea Aguilar
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Oscar Acosta
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Gilberto Rosales
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Hector Polanco-Alvarez
Represented By
Rachel Emily Nadas
Handley Farah & Anderson PLLC
contact info
Matthew Bryce Kaplan
The Kaplan Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
49 49 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 01/26 4:58 PM
FINAL ORDER (Granting Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Case) - THIS MATTER is before the Court on the parties' "Consent Motion for Final Approval of Fair Labor Standards Act Settlement" (ECF No. 44) and "Consent Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees" (ECF No. 46). Upon consideration of the Parties' Motions and having held an approval hearing on January 26, 2022, it is hereby ORDERED that both Motions are GRANTED and that the Parties' Settlement Agreement and Release (ECF No. 45-1) is APPROVED as fair and adequate. Defendants shall pay Plaintiffs according to the Settlement Agreement and Release and further pay Plaintiffs' counsel $86,000.00 for reasonable attorneys' fees and costs. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, except that this Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement pursuant to Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of Am., 511 U.S. 375 (1994). This case is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/26/2022. (smej, )
Related: [-]
48 48 minutes 1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Motion Hearing Wed 01/26 11:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Court Reporter Harding, OCR): Motions Hearing held on 1/26/2022 re44 Consent Motion for Final Approval of Fair Labor Standards Act Settlement and46 Consent Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees. Hearing held remotely via Zoom. Factual findings made by the Court; settlement approved by the Court. Court to retain jurisdiction for purposes of enforcing the settlement agreement. Order to enter, case to be closed. (rpiz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
47 47 notice Notice (other) Tue 01/25 7:28 PM
NOTICE by Jennifer Munoz, Jennifer Munoz, Gilberto Rosales re45 Memorandum in Support, NOTICE OF ERRATUM (Kaplan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
46 46 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Mon 01/24 11:27 AM
Consent MOTION Approval of Agreed Attorneys' Fees in FLSA Settlement re44 Consent MOTION for Settlement Approval PLAINTIFFS CONSENT MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Oscar Acosta, Azalea Aguilar, Emer Samir Rodriguez Avila, Carlos Anibal Bedoya, Rogelio Antonio Benitez, Luis Manuel Brene, Nolberto Bueso, Marcos Cabrera, Jeronimo Chavez, Jorge Colin-Garfias, Ramon Antonio Mejia Costello, Ramon Escalante, Javier Fernandez, Alvin Garcia, Franklin Rolando Morazan Isaguirre, Chelston Juarez, Peyton Rodriguez Lugo, Josue Esteban Morales, Jennifer Munoz, Jennifer Munoz, Carlos Heriberto Benitez Orellana, Oscar Ortez-Nuila, Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Abel Bartolon Ramos, Cristian Romero, Jose Romero, Yenyffer Romero, Gilberto Rosales, William Alexander Salgado, Miguel Villeda.(Kaplan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 13, 2022
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/13 10:30 AM
Set Hearings as to44 Consent Motion for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement: Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2022 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson Related [+] (rpiz)
Related: [-] mote via Zoom
Friday, December 24, 2021
45 45 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 12/24 12:28 PM
Memorandum in Support re44 Consent MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by Jennifer Munoz, Gilberto Rosales.(Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, Declaration of Matthew Kaplan,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, Schedule of Payments
44 44 motion Settlement Fri 12/24 12:24 PM
Consent MOTION for Settlement Approval by Jennifer Munoz, Gilberto Rosales.(Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
43 43 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Tue 11/23 2:49 PM
ORDER - UPON CONSIDERATION of the Unopposed Motion to Substitute Successor Plaintiff for Deceased Plaintiff Hector Jose Polanco-Alvarez (ECF No. 42): ORDERED, that the Motion is GRANTED; ORDERED, that Jennifer Munoz be substituted into this action for deceased Plaintiff Hector Jose Polanco-Alvarez as the Next Friend of E.T. and H.P., the minor children of Mr. Polanco-Alvarez, and that she by styled as a party as "E.T. and H.P., by their mother and next friend, Jennifer Munoz." Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/23/2021. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
42 42 motion Substitute Party Mon 11/22 8:11 PM
Consent MOTION to Substitute Party UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SUCCESSOR PLAINTIFF FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF HECTOR JOSE POLANCO-ALVAREZ AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Oscar Acosta, Azalea Aguilar, Emer Samir Rodriguez Avila, Carlos Anibal Bedoya, Rogelio Antonio Benitez, Luis Manuel Brene, Nolberto Bueso, Marcos Cabrera, Jeronimo Chavez, Jorge Colin-Garfias, Ramon Antonio Mejia Costello, Ramon Escalante, Javier Fernandez, Alvin Garcia, Franklin Rolando Morazan Isaguirre, Chelston Juarez, Peyton Rodriguez Lugo, Josue Esteban Morales, Carlos Heriberto Benitez Orellana, Oscar Ortez-Nuila, Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Abel Bartolon Ramos, Cristian Romero, Jose Romero, Yenyffer Romero, Gilberto Rosales, William Alexander Salgado, Miguel Villeda, Jennifer Munoz.(Kaplan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer Munoz,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew B. Kaplan,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, October 08, 2021
41 41 notice Notice of Settlement (by Attorney) Fri 10/08 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Settlement NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY ALL PARTIES by Oscar Acosta, Azalea Aguilar, Emer Samir Rodriguez Avila, Carlos Anibal Bedoya, Rogelio Antonio Benitez, Luis Manuel Brene, Nolberto Bueso, Marcos Cabrera, Jeronimo Chavez, Jorge Colin-Garfias, Ramon Antonio Mejia Costello, Ramon Escalante, Javier Fernandez, Alvin Garcia, Franklin Rolando Morazan Isaguirre, Chelston Juarez, Peyton Rodriguez Lugo, Josue Esteban Morales, Carlos Heriberto Benitez Orellana, Oscar Ortez-Nuila, Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Abel Bartolon Ramos, Cristian Romero, Jose Romero, Yenyffer Romero, Gilberto Rosales, William Alexander Salgado, Miguel Villeda (Kaplan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 08/05 10:25 AM
Settlement Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. (mful)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
40 40 4 pgs order Order Wed 07/28 4:13 PM
ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on October 13, 2021 at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 7/28/2021. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 17, 2021
39 39 misc Status Report Sat 07/17 6:15 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by GTO Drywall, RDIC Incorporated. (Feinberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
38 38 order Protective Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 05/03 10:44 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER re:37 Consent MOTION for Protective Order filed by GTO Drywall, RDIC Incorporated (See Protective Order for Details.). Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 5/3/2021. (asho, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
37 37 motion Protective Order Tue 04/27 11:03 AM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by GTO Drywall, RDIC Incorporated. (Feinberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
36 36 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/12 3:09 PM
INITAL PRETRIAL ORDER - Bench Trial set for 1/18/2022 at 9:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/12/2021) (rpiz)
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/12 3:08 PM
ORDER (Settlement Conference Referral) It is hereby ORDERED that the settlement conference and proceedings required by section l(E)(l) of Pretrial Schedule A are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. Counsel shall be responsible for contacting the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Hanes within five (5) days of the date of this Order t schedule the conference, which should occur at least thirty (30) days before the start of trial and at such time as Magistrate Judge Hanes shall approve. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/12/2021. Copies distributed as directed.(asho, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/12 3:14 PM
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes per Order35 . (asho, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 04/08 3:19 PM
Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/8/2021 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Fri 04/02 12:48 PM
ORDER Granting31 Motion for Pro hac vice added George Andrew Voegele, Jr. for Capital Interior Contractors. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/2/2021. (asho, )
Related: [-]
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Fri 04/02 12:45 PM
ORDER Granting32 Motion for Pro hac vice added Jason Alexander Cabrera for Capital Interior Contractors. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/2/2021. (asho, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
32 32 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/01 5:15 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason Alexander Cabrera and Certification of Local Counsel Elizabeth C. Burneson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7703407. by Capital Interior Contractors.(Burneson, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application to Qualify
31 31 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/01 5:12 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by George Andrew Voegele, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Elizabeth C. Burneson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7703399. by Capital Interior Contractors.(Burneson, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application to Qualify
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/23 3:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by RDIC Incorporated.(Feinberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/23 3:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by GTO Drywall.(Feinberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
28 28 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/12 2:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 9:00 AM via Zoom before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/03 10:19 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Capital Interior Contractors.(Story, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
26 26 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/23 1:29 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RDIC Incorporated. (Feinberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/23 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Edward Feinberg on behalf of RDIC Incorporated (Feinberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/23 1:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GTO Drywall. (Feinberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/23 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Edward Feinberg on behalf of GTO Drywall (Feinberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/17 4:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Capital Interior Contractors, GTO Drywall, RDIC Incorporated, filed by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales.(Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 02/17 1:57 PM
ORDER (Granting Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint) re:20 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file their Second Amended Complaint. Defendant Capital Interior Contractors' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (ECF No.15 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/17/2021. (asho, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
20 20 motion Leave to File Document Fri 02/12 5:32 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales.(Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/12 2:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. GTO Drywall waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 02/12 2:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales, Oscar Acosta. RDIC Incorporated waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
17 17 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 01/29 11:36 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Capital Interior Contractors. (Story, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
16 16 22 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 01/29 11:35 AM
Memorandum in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Capital Interior Contractors.(Story, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 01/29 11:33 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Capital Interior Contractors. (Story, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of Consent to Join Suit Wed 12/23 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Rachel Emily Nadas on behalf of Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales(Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consents to Join,
Att: 2 Consents to Join
Thursday, December 17, 2020
13 13 service Summons Reissued Thu 12/17 4:33 PM
Summons Reissued as to Capital Interior Contractors, GTO Drywall, RDIC Incorporated. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically reissued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the Amended Complaint. (asho, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
12 12 misc Proposed Summons Wed 12/16 7:40 PM
Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Summons Wed 12/16 7:39 PM
Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Proposed Summons Wed 12/16 7:38 PM
Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/16 7:25 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gilberto Rosales, Hector Polanco-Alvarez.(Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
misc Notice of Correction Tue 12/08 2:07 PM
Notice of Correction re7 NOTICE OF ERRATA. The filing user is notified to file an Amended Complaint with the party correction and new proposed summonses for all defendants that the Clerk will re-issue. (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
8 8 misc Proposed Summons Wed 12/02 4:21 PM
Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (other) Wed 12/02 3:32 PM
NOTICE by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales (Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/02 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Bryce Kaplan on behalf of Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales (Kaplan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 12/02 8:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Capital Interior Contractors, GTO Drywall, RDIC Incorporated. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 12/02 8:15 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (tjoh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Tue 12/01 3:08 PM
Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Tue 12/01 3:08 PM
Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 12/01 3:07 PM
Proposed Summons by Hector Polanco-Alvarez, Gilberto Rosales. (Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/01 3:05 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7521000.), filed by Gilberto Rosales, Hector Polanco-Alvarez.(Nadas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Consent to Join,
Att: 3 Consent to Join