Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:20-cv-01030
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2020
Terminated:Feb 28, 2022
Last checked: Sunday May 30, 2021 3:42 AM CDT
Defendant
Auto Max, LLC
Represented By
Garrett P. Buttrey
Fordharrison Llp (nashville Office)
contact info
Paul Maxwell Smith, III
Fordharrison Llp (nashville Office)
contact info
Mark E. Stamelos
Fordharrison Llp (nashville Office)
contact info
Defendant
Auto World of Nashville, LLC
Represented By
Garrett P. Buttrey
Fordharrison Llp (nashville Office)
contact info
Paul Maxwell Smith, III
Fordharrison Llp (nashville Office)
contact info
Mark E. Stamelos
Fordharrison Llp (nashville Office)
contact info
Defendant
Abdolreza Farhangi
Represented By
Garrett P. Buttrey
Fordharrison Llp (nashville Office)
contact info
Paul Maxwell Smith, III
Fordharrison Llp (nashville Office)
contact info
Mark E. Stamelos
Fordharrison Llp (nashville Office)
contact info
Plaintiff
Felipe Vera Castillo
Represented By
Nina H. Parsley
Michael D. Ponce & Associates
contact info
Robert E. Turner, IV
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Gordon E. Jackson
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Robert E. Morelli, III
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Nathaniel A. Bishop
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
J. Russ Bryant
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Plaintiff
Rafael Vazquez
Represented By
Nina H. Parsley
Michael D. Ponce & Associates
contact info
Robert E. Turner, IV
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Gordon E. Jackson
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Robert E. Morelli, III
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Nathaniel A. Bishop
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
J. Russ Bryant
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Cooper
Represented By
Nina H. Parsley
Michael D. Ponce & Associates
contact info
Robert E. Turner, IV
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Gordon E. Jackson
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Robert E. Morelli, III
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Nathaniel A. Bishop
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
J. Russ Bryant
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
40 40 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/02 1:50 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal seeking to dismiss this FLSA action with prejudice35 . In accordance with the Court's July 11, 2022 Order38 , the parties filed a copy of the signed settlement agreement without the confidentiality provision39 -1. Accordingly, pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/2/2022. (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
39 39 notice Notice of Filing Fri 07/29 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, Abdolreza Farhangi re38 Order,,(Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement
Monday, July 11, 2022
38 38 2 pgs order Order Mon 07/11 12:55 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal seeking to dismiss this FLSA action with prejudice35 . Although the parties did not request to file the settlement agreement under seal, the proposed settlement agreement contains a confidentiality clause. Accordingly, by July 29, 2022, Defendant may file additional briefing - not to exceed five pages - explaining why the confidentiality provision is enforceable or the parties may resubmit a signed copy of the proposed settlement agreement without the confidentiality provision. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/11/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
37 37 notice Notice of Filing Fri 07/08 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, Abdolreza Farhangi re36 Order,,(Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Settlement Agreement
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/28 3:54 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal seeking to dismiss this FLSA action with prejudice.35 . Although the requested dismissal appears to be pursuant to a settlement agreement, the parties have not filed the settlement agreement for review by the Court. On or before July 8, 2022, the parties shall file the settlement agreement for review by the Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/28/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 06/27 1:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Felipe Vera Castillo, Ryan Cooper. (Morelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
34 34 1 pgs order Order Administratively Closing Case Mon 02/28 4:55 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: The Court has been advised that this action is settled.33 . Accordingly, this case is administratively closed. On or before March 28, 2022, the parties shall submit a proposed agreed order of compromise and dismissal or stipulation of dismissal. Absent the aforementioned filing or other filing from a party, this case will be dismissed with prejudice after that date. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/28/2022. (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
33 33 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 02/25 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, Abdolreza Farhangi (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 01/24 4:56 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Paul Maxwell Smith, III terminated. Attorney Paige M. Lyle substituted. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/24/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference by Telephone Fri 01/28 2:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 1/24/2022. (Hearing lasted :6)(ms)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
31 31 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 01/21 4:11 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, Abdolreza Farhangi. (Lyle, Paige)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 09/20 4:54 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to dismiss Plaintiff Rafael Vasquez as a party. (Doc. No.29 ). The Motion is GRANTED. The claims brought by Rafael Vasquez are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21. The Clerk is directed to terminate Rafael Vasquez as a party. Rafael Vazquez terminated. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/20/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ln)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
29 29 motion Dismiss Fri 09/17 10:37 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Rafael Vazquez Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 21 by Felipe Vera Castillo, Ryan Cooper, Rafael Vazquez. (Bishop, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
28 28 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 06/04 4:01 PM
ANSWER to27 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, Abdolreza Farhangi.(Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
27 27 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/28 4:38 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, Abdolreza Farhangi, filed by Felipe Vera Castillo, Rafael Vazquez and Ryan Cooper. (kc) Modified on 5/28/2021 (kc)
Related: [-]
26 26 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave Mon 05/24 8:31 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/21/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
25 25 motion Leave Fri 04/30 4:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Felipe Vera Castillo, Rafael Vazquez.(Bishop, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint
Thursday, March 25, 2021
24 24 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 03/25 2:13 PM
ORDER granting re23 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, and Abdolreza Farhangi. Attorney Garrett P. Buttrey terminated. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/25/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
23 23 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 03/24 3:57 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, Abdolreza Farhangi. (Smith, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
22 22 4 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Thu 03/11 9:29 AM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial is set for 10/25/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Exhibit List due by 10/10/2022. Witness List due by 10/10/2022. Pretrial Conference is set for 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2022. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/11/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
21 21 order Case Management Order Wed 03/10 4:20 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2021. Discovery due by 2/28/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2022. Telephone Conference is set for 1/24/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/10/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference by Telephone Wed 03/10 3:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 3/10/2021. (Hearing lasted :13)(ms)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
20 20 misc Proposed Case Management Order Fri 03/05 5:07 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, Abdolreza Farhangi. (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 03/05 5:05 PM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, Abdolreza Farhangi.(Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/02 4:35 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re10 Amended Complaint Auto Max, LLC answer due 3/5/2021; Auto World of Nashville, LLC answer due 3/5/2021; and Abdolreza Farhangi answer due 3/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/2/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/01 10:04 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Unopposed by Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, Abdolreza Farhangi. (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/26 8:40 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint Auto Max, LLC answer due 3/1/2021; Auto World of Nashville, LLC answer due 3/1/2021; and Abdolreza Farhangi answer due 3/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/26/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 02/25 9:32 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark E. Stamelos and Garrett P. Buttrey admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/24 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett P. Buttrey on behalf of All Defendants (Buttrey, Garrett)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Wed 02/24 10:28 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Auto World of Nashville, LLC. (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Wed 02/24 10:26 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Auto Max, LLC. (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/24 10:24 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re10 Amended Complaint by Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, Abdolreza Farhangi. (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/24 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Stamelos on behalf of All Defendants (Stamelos, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Fri 02/12 5:58 PM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/11 2:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Felipe Vera Castillo, Rafael Vazquez.(Bryant, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 02/02 2:25 PM
ORDER: MOTION GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to March 10, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/2/2021. (kc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 02/10 10:54 AM
Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley per Order9 . (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
8 8 motion Continue Fri 01/29 4:14 PM
First MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Felipe Vera Castillo. (Bishop, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/27 8:41 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Felipe Vera Castillo. All Defendants. (Turner, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/08 3:18 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/08/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ln)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 12/02 8:16 AM
Summons issued as to Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, and Abdolreza Farhangi. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
4 4 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 12/01 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 2/9/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Tue 12/01 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 12/01 4:47 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/01 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Auto Max, LLC, Auto World of Nashville, LLC, and Abdolreza Farhangi (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3266530), filed by Felipe Vera-Castillo. ( #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 12/01 4:49 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert E. Morelli, III, Nina H. Parsley, Gordon E. Jackson, J. Russ Bryant, Robert E. Turner, IV, and Nathaniel A. Bishop admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]