Sneed v. CBA of GA, Inc.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard W Story |
Referred: | J Clay Fuller |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00277 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday May 30, 2021 6:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
CBA of GA, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Sneed
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 14, 2021 | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Thu 01/14 8:30 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (dgr) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 01/14 8:31 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller terminated from case. (dgr) |
||
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal CBA of GA, Inc., dba Credit Bureau Associates filed by Deborah Sneed (Berry, Matthew) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Settlement CBA of GA, Inc., dba Credit Bureau Associates. by Deborah Sneed (Berry, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (dgs) (ADI) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Interested Persons by Deborah Sneed. (Berry, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() GENERAL ORDER 20-01 EIGHTH AMENDMENT IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/28/2020. (dgr) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Deborah Sneed. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10432655)(dgr) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |