Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Richard W Story
Referred: J Clay Fuller
Case #: 2:20-cv-00277
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2020
Terminated:Jan 14, 2021
Last checked: Sunday May 30, 2021 6:17 AM EDT
Defendant
CBA of GA, Inc.
Plaintiff
Deborah Sneed
Represented By
Matthew Thomas Berry
Berry & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Matthew J Landreau
Berry & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 14, 2021
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 01/14 8:30 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 01/14 8:31 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller terminated from case. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/13 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal CBA of GA, Inc., dba Credit Bureau Associates filed by Deborah Sneed (Berry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 01/11 6:53 PM
NOTICE of Settlement CBA of GA, Inc., dba Credit Bureau Associates. by Deborah Sneed (Berry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/09 10:00 AM
NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 12/02 8:57 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Deborah Sneed. (Berry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
2 2 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/01 4:39 PM
GENERAL ORDER 20-01 EIGHTH AMENDMENT IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/28/2020. (dgr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/01 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Deborah Sneed. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10432655)(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet