Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Andrew P Rodovich
Referred: Joshua P Kolar
Case #: 2:20-cv-00441
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2020
Terminated:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 31, 2021 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Aamir Badruddin
Represented By
Christopher P Rubey
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Sb/in
contact info
Jeanine M Gozdecki
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Sb/in
contact info
Defendant
Community Care Network Inc
Represented By
Christopher P Rubey
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Sb/in
contact info
Jeanine M Gozdecki
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Sb/in
contact info
Defendant
Munster Medical Research Foundation Inc
Represented By
Christopher P Rubey
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Sb/in
contact info
Jeanine M Gozdecki
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Sb/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Tareq Kass-Hout
Hoeppner Wagner & Evans LLP 8585 Broadway Suite 790
Merrillville, IN 46410
Represented By
Kimberly P Peil
Hoeppner Wagner & Evans Llp - Mer/in
contact info
Andrew T Shupp
Hoeppner Wagner & Evans Llp - Val/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
71 71 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 09/25 1:25 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS70 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice and DISMISSES this cause WITH PREJUDICE. This case is now closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/25/2024. (ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
70 70 motion Dismiss Thu 09/19 4:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss (Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice) by Defendants Aamir Badruddin, Community Care Network Inc, Alan Kumar, Munster Medical Research Foundation Inc. (Gozdecki, Jeanine)
Related: [-]