Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William C Griesbach
Case #: 1:20-cv-01780
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2020
Terminated:Aug 12, 2021
Case in other court:Wisconsin Western, 3:20-cv-00958
Last checked: Monday May 31, 2021 5:16 AM CDT
Defendant
Stephenson National Bank & Trust
Represented By
Andrew S Oettinger
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
Deborah Machalow
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Keith Boye
Represented By
Larry P Smith
Smithmarco PC
contact info
David M Marco
Smithmarco PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, August 12, 2021
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/12 9:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Keith Boye. (Marco, David)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys Thu 08/12 9:43 AM
Case dismissed with prejudice in its entirety and with each party to bear their own fees and costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) upon the21 Stipulation of the parties. (tlf)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
20 20 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Order Mon 07/26 10:09 AM
ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 7/26/2021 VACATING all remaining scheduling order deadlines. Counsel shall file a motion to dismiss or stipulation of dismissal within 30 days. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 07/23 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Keith Boye. (Marco, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
18 18 order Protective Order Tue 02/23 12:10 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 2/23/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
17 17 motion Protective Order Thu 02/18 12:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Keith Boye.(Marco, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order
Thursday, January 07, 2021
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/07 8:59 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 1/7/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
15 15 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/07 8:57 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/6/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2021, Discovery due by 9/3/2021, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 5/5/2021, Rebuttal Expert Witness List due by 7/8/2021, Motions due by 10/1/2021, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 1/15/2021. (Tape #010621) (mac)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Mon 12/28 3:08 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Stephenson National Bank & Trust. (Oettinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
13 13 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 12/22 5:32 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Keith Boye. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Smith, Larry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/10 3:01 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Stephenson National Bank & Trust.(Oettinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 12/10 2:59 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Stephenson National Bank & Trust. (Oettinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 12/10 2:58 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Stephenson National Bank & Trust. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Oettinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 12/02 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2021 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 12/30/2020. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 12/02 1:17 PM
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion Wed 12/02 10:35 AM
ORDER granting6 Joint Motion to Transfer to Eastern District of Wisconsin, Green Bay Division. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/1/2020. (kwf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 12/02 1:23 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
6 6 Joint MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin, Green Bay Division by Plaintiff Keith Boye. Brief in Opposition due 12/22/2020. Brief in Reply due 1/4/2021. (Marco, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
5 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew S. Oettinger for Defendant Stephenson National Bank & Trust. (Oettinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Deborah Machalow for Defendant Stephenson National Bank & Trust. (Machalow, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
3 3 Summons Issued as to Stephenson National Bank & Trust. (kwf)
Related: [-]
Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
Related: [-]
Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (kwf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
2 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Larry P. Smith for Plaintiff Keith Boye. (Smith, Larry)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT against Stephenson National Bank & Trust. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2766649.), filed by Keith Boye. (Marco, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons