District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Emmet G Sullivan
Case #: 1:20-cv-03507
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2020
Terminated:May 04, 2021
Last checked: Monday May 31, 2021 5:53 AM EDT
Defendant
ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By
Carol Federighi
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Laurel H. Lum
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
ITSERVE ALLIANCE, INC.
Represented By
Bradley Bruce Banias
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
Jonathan D. Wasden
Wasden Banias LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CHAD WOLF
Terminated: 04/19/2021
Represented By
Alexandra Rachel Saslaw
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Carol Federighi
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Laurel H. Lum
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Monday, May 03, 2021
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/03 5:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting13 Joint Motion for Administrative Closure. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/3/2021. (lcegs2)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/19 11:47 AM
Joint MOTION For Administrative Closure by ITSERVE ALLIANCE, INC..(Banias, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, April 03, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Sat 04/03 8:52 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 4/19/2021, (mac)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/02 5:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than April 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/2/2021. (lcegs2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/01 5:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by CHAD WOLF.(Saslaw, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 01, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/01 3:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting11 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's response shall be filed no later than April 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/1/2021. (lcegs2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/01 3:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Response due by 4/5/2021. (mac)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/29 6:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CHAD WOLF.(Saslaw, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 12/23 11:55 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHAD WOLF served on 12/7/2020(Wasden, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Wed 12/23 11:52 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/7/2020.(Wasden, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Wed 12/23 11:51 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/2/2021.(Wasden, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service
Friday, December 11, 2020
7 7 order Standing Order Fri 12/11 10:51 AM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/11/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/08 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Rachel Saslaw on behalf of All Defendants (Saslaw, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/07 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of All Defendants (Lum, Laurel)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/07 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of All Defendants (Federighi, Carol)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 12/03 11:25 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CHAD WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/03 11:21 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Wed 12/02 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ITSERVE ALLIANCE, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-3175 Stellar IT et al v. Scalia et al and 1:20-cv-3006 Purdue University et al v. Scalia. (Wasden, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/02 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against CHAD WOLF ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7907255) filed by ITSERVE ALLIANCE, INC..(Wasden, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons USAG,
Att: 3 Summons USAO,
Att: 4 Summons DHS