Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Martha M Pacold
Case #: 1:20-cv-07127
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2020
Terminated:Mar 22, 2021
Last checked: Monday May 31, 2021 3:57 AM CDT
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Defendant
1CAR&
Defendant
402EPAGCBS
Defendant
9PXX1YQ33M
Defendant
9UNE2VPEBT
Defendant
AK007 Store
Defendant
AK113 Store
Defendant
Ajialive
Defendant
Angel Baby's House
Defendant
BEEPBOOP
Defendant
BOSENKE
Defendant
Bacaz Wallpapers123 Store
Defendant
CAOguihuo6031
Defendant
CSDHGHNM
Defendant
CYGBX7SYU5
Defendant
Can't tell goodbye
Defendant
CarolynLusby
Defendant
Christophererlinfafs
Defendant
Customary Store
Defendant
Cyril Julia
Defendant
DECIOUS
Defendant
Downdedo
Defendant
Dream boat L
Defendant
ElizabethGravel
Defendant
Enjoy-Sexy
Defendant
FSDCV
Defendant
Fame Store
Defendant
Feikkpelan
Defendant
Fengyi Huanhui
Defendant
Fulian Yuan shop
Defendant
G9X6K6QSF7
Defendant
GOFUSO
Defendant
GaoXinKaiFaQuYaoKeXiaoChiDian
Defendant
Gufamily Information Technology Co Limited
Defendant
HENGHUAMETAL
Defendant
HOHOWINTER
Defendant
HangZhouQingJiWuZiMaoYiYouXianGongSi
Defendant
HugeRetail
Defendant
JHKEWH
Defendant
JOJOFUN
Defendant
Janet Orzech
Defendant
Jason Paigei
Defendant
Jennifer Risalvato III
Defendant
JiaoKouXian NvRenHua FuZhuangDian
Defendant
Juan Alexis
Defendant
KHRHVS1XI0
Defendant
KUHNISGDD
Defendant
KUNISAYA
Defendant
Katie Legg
Defendant
Kinggoldera
Defendant
LYDIA STEPHENSON
Defendant
Lingchen
Defendant
Lovetoyes
Defendant
Lucy Oliver
Defendant
LvLiangShiLiShiQuLiuGaiMeiZongHeJingXiaoBu
Defendant
MXZKMY
Defendant
Mens Casual Pants Hall Store
Defendant
MiFaLaire
Defendant
MiMosa Elves
Defendant
MoMo-Trade
Defendant
Mr_10612
Defendant
NGABS
Defendant
NICHOLAS TOMLINSON
Defendant
NOAH MAHMOOD
Defendant
Neptune Mall
Defendant
Nona E Ansell
Defendant
PDSCEG2O3A
Defendant
Qiaolll
Defendant
QingHaiXuYunWenHuaChuanMeiYouXianGongSi
Defendant
SAMBRIC Retail shop2
Defendant
SOFIA THORPE
Defendant
Shop5871564 Store
Defendant
Shop900235332 Store
Defendant
Shop910614023 Store
Defendant
Shop910716086 Store
Defendant
Shop910721170 Store
Defendant
TAMMYE
Defendant
TRdY PAGE
Defendant
TaiAnShiTaiShanQuTangBaoBaiHuoDian
Defendant
Toshiko-M
Defendant
USbabys
Defendant
Vicky Vandenberg
Defendant
WeiFangShunYuanFangZhiYouXianGongSi
Defendant
Xaeoti50
Defendant
YanTaiYingJieMaoYiYouXianGongSi
Defendant
Yi yi clothing store
Defendant
Yongxing county fu and love life supermarket
Defendant
Yopria-us
Defendant
You are April of the world
Defendant
Yu hua
Defendant
ZBS702103
Defendant
Zachary Burhop
Defendant
Zepplin Store
Defendant
ZhengZhouXinJiKangYiYaoKeJiYouXianGongSi
Defendant
Zhongmingt
Defendant
amzonzoonnmm.
Defendant
an11gwayash
Defendant
aynixitl
Defendant
bai qingvsd
Defendant
beautiful your house Store
Defendant
cathy caudill
Defendant
changfengdianzixinxikeji
Defendant
chengdushiqingbaijiangquzhengxinglu99haojunxiang
Defendant
cool-guy
Defendant
fu hairong
Defendant
g3rgfh
Defendant
ghrgrf11
Defendant
guangxibaodengjiancaiyouxiangongsi
Defendant
guangzhoudamohuyangguanggaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
guangzhousenchukejiyouxiangongsi
Defendant
gusuqumiaofengfuzhuangdian
Defendant
henanqianxinmenyeyouxiangongsi
Defendant
huixinhexinmaoyi
Defendant
jeameng
Defendant
juyueshangmaobu
Defendant
li linxcvxcsdfe
Defendant
liaoxiaofang4514156
Defendant
linxiantubanxiliangchaoshi
Defendant
liudongjie19911
Defendant
liufenglan521
Defendant
lx-black- watermelon store
Defendant
maihuiru
Defendant
mijiLU
Defendant
mnbvcxm
Defendant
night night
Defendant
nnnnnnnnnnnngf
Defendant
qingdaohainayunzhishangmaoyouxian
Defendant
qingdaosakelinashangmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
qingzhoushifudichaoshi
Defendant
sdfdsjlkf
Defendant
sihuichen3215
Defendant
sufudd
Defendant
tianjinshizhuoyefadaqicheyongpinyouxvltt
Defendant
tjnsga
Defendant
vivahouse1
Defendant
wrtyuioytgrfsd
Defendant
xinchengqujundebaihuoshang
Defendant
xuyiqingchunnianhuawangkating
Defendant
yanchengshishenghongkongdiaoshebeizhizaoyouxiangon
Defendant
yangzhoushimiweimaoyiyouxiangovzn
Defendant
yaoanlianxindiannaokejiyouxiangongsi
Defendant
yqwl
Defendant
yu jing jing1
Defendant
yuecaijing325
Defendant
yunshigongyangshengguan
Defendant
zherongwangqiangdianzishangwu
Defendant
zhihuihongankeji
Defendant
zhong palza
Defendant
zhucuihong3256
Plaintiff
H-D U.S.A., LLC
Represented By
Amy Crout Ziegler
Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.
contact info
Martin Francis Trainor
Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.
contact info
Justin R. Gaudio
Greer Burns & Crain Ltd
contact info
RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Greer, Burns & Crain
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
AMNCY
Terminated: 02/12/2021
Defendant
Arthur76Yerkes
Terminated: 02/12/2021
Defendant
BAKEYE ETL
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
Bestimes
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
CAILINGG
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
CAINIAOF
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
COOLESTSTART Factory Store
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
ChansonNuage
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
DSJKD
Terminated: 01/22/2021
Defendant
GREAT CONCEPT TECHNOLOGY LIMITED
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
GUKISALA-US
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Goodsdiy
Terminated: 03/01/2021
Defendant
GuangZhouSuMingDuWangLuoKeJiBu
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
HNJDRF
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
HUHUGO
Terminated: 03/01/2021
Defendant
HeNanShengLinMiaoMuXiaoShouYouXianGongSi
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
JiaoZhouShiYongYuWangLuoGongZuoShi
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
KENADVI STORE
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
KINGJIE
Terminated: 02/12/2021
Defendant
KORKOR
Terminated: 02/12/2021
Defendant
Lifgang
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
Linyi xianda trading co. LTD
Terminated: 01/22/2021
Defendant
LongGangQuAErXiangLanZhouLaMianGuan
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
MIGAGA-DESIGN
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
MIRACLE CLOCK
Terminated: 01/29/2021
Defendant
MISCERY-US
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Mao Jiandun
Terminated: 03/05/2021
Defendant
MeiYaa
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
PRINTME
Terminated: 01/29/2021
Defendant
PersonalizedGiftStation
Terminated: 02/12/2021
Defendant
SAZANG
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Shuoxin
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
TimBewe
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
WIN-SHOP
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
WYFOLUXD
Terminated: 02/12/2021
Defendant
WenPingF
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
YMGS
Terminated: 02/12/2021
Defendant
ZHAOXIAOHONGSFD
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
ZYMGS
Terminated: 02/12/2021
Defendant
ZhenZhouShi ErQiQuLingYuFengBaoDianZiShangHang
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
Zhenchao Trade
Terminated: 02/12/2021
Defendant
bailingzhangliting
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
chen shengdong cv.m
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
chuxionghongrunfangdichankaifayouxiangongsi
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
dezhoushidechengquyuexinjigongbaodian
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
guanruifushimaoyi
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Defendant
hainanzhongxinhuinengyuan
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
hldxuzkhus
Terminated: 03/19/2021
Defendant
huangxiaoyan427
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
lime IG UO
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
lishengshangmao
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
liu zhirongjhgurftg
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
luolaihua us
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
nhadv
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
nshiyantaqushiya
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
qinduquleguandejipaidian
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
rtyuiopuytre
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
shenyangshihunnanquzhengzhengxiangzhonghaibaozipu
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
shijiazhuangshengrunchangdayingxiaocehuayouxiangon
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
tang chunhua
Terminated: 03/23/2021
Defendant
tianyaya us
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Defendant
wondrtgift
Terminated: 02/12/2021
Defendant
xingfuxinchengmen
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
xiwangguiye
Terminated: 03/12/2021
Defendant
zhangweitengfeius
Terminated: 02/05/2021


Docket last updated: 03/04/2021 5:04 AM CST
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by H-D U.S.A., LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17700334.(Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
2 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC Schedule A regarding complaint1 (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
4 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin)
Related: [-]