New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:20-cv-10137
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2020
Terminated:Dec 17, 2020
Last checked: Monday May 31, 2021 5:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Desktop Metal, Inc.
Defendant
M. Ian G. Gilchrist
Defendant
Leo Hindery, Jr.
Defendant
Josephine Linden
Defendant
Marc Nathanson
Defendant
Kent R. Sander
Defendant
Sparrow Merger Sub, Inc.
Defendant
Trine Acquisition Corp.
Defendant
Tom Wasserman
Defendant
Abbas F. Zuaiter
Plaintiff
Sean Peay
Represented By
Timothy John MacFall
Rigrodsky & Long, P.A.(lis)
contact info


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Monday, December 28, 2020
utility Case Designation Mon 12/28 9:30 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (ad)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 12/28 9:31 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/17 6:12 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Desktop Metal, Inc., M. Ian G. Gilchrist, Leo Hindery, Jr., Josephine Linden, Marc Nathanson, Kent R. Sander, Sparrow Merger Sub, Inc., Trine Acquisition Corp., Tom Wasserman, Abbas F. Zuaiter. Document filed by Sean Peay. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
21 21 service Summons Issued Thu 12/03 12:19 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Desktop Metal, Inc.. (sj)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Issued Thu 12/03 12:16 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sparrow Merger Sub, Inc.. (sj)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Issued Thu 12/03 12:09 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marc Nathanson. (sj)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued Thu 12/03 12:06 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kent R. Sander. (sj)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued Thu 12/03 12:00 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tom Wasserman. (sj)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued Thu 12/03 11:57 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M. Ian G. Gilchrist. (sj)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Thu 12/03 11:55 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Josephine Linden. (sj)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Thu 12/03 11:52 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Leo Hindery, Jr.. (sj)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Thu 12/03 11:49 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trine Acquisition Corp.. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Related Case Statement Thu 12/03 11:37 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Timothy John MacFall, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 12/03 11:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Timothy John MacFall. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 12/03 11:45 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 12/03 11:45 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Thu 12/03 11:46 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Ronnie Abrams as possibly related to 1:20cv10056 (sj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/02 5:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Desktop Metal, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Peay..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/02 5:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sparrow Merger Sub, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Peay..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/02 5:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abbas F. Zuaiter, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Peay..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/02 5:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marc Nathanson, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Peay..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/02 5:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kent R. Sander, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Peay..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/02 5:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tom Wasserman, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Peay..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/02 5:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M. Ian G. Gilchrist, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Peay..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/02 5:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Josephine Linden, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Peay..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/02 5:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Leo Hindery, Jr., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Peay..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/02 5:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Trine Acquisition Corp., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Peay..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/02 5:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/02 5:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Desktop Metal, Inc., M. Ian G. Gilchrist, Leo Hindery, Jr., Josephine Linden, Marc Nathanson, Kent R. Sander, Sparrow Merger Sub, Inc., Trine Acquisition Corp., Tom Wasserman, Abbas F. Zuaiter. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22852069)Document filed by Sean Peay..(MacFall, Timothy)
Related: [-]