California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Referred: Edmund F Brennan
Case #: 2:14-cv-01375
Nature of Suit625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881
Cause21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2014
Terminated:Oct 23, 2014
Last checked: Monday Jan 19, 2015 7:43 PM PST
Defendant
2008 Mercedes Benz CL 63 AMG Coupe, VIN: WDDEJ77X28A010863, California License Number: 7AGY715
Defendant
2012 Ford F-250 Truck, VIN: 1FT7W2BT4CEA03491, California License Number: 19315H1
Defendant
Approximately $195,590.84 Seized from Bank of George Account Number 1020203723, Held in the Name of IT Pitstop, Inc.
Defendant
Approximately $463,960.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Kevin Christopher Khasigian
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jun 10 2014
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/10/14 ORDERING the issuance of warrant for arrest of articles in rem. (Becknal, R)
GPO Jun 12 2014
6;195,590.84 seized from Bank of George in Las Vegas, Nevada.(Waggoner, D)APPLICATION and ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/12/2014 as to defendant Approximately $463,960.00 in U.S. Currency, defendant 2012 Ford F-250, defendant 2008 Mercedes Benz, and defendant Approximately 
GPO Oct 21 2014
the defendant currency referenced in the above caption. That a final judgment be entered, forfeiting all right, title, and interest in the defendant currency to the United States, to be disposed of according to law; That the Default Judgment and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/21/14 Recommending that Kendall Thrift, Malissa Thrift, Cameron Thrift, Jaevon White and IT Pitstop, Inc. be held in default. That the United States' MOTION for Default Judgment and Final Judgment of forfeiture 12 be GRANTED; That judgment by default be entered against any right, title, or interest of potential claimants Kendall Thrift, Malissa Thrift, Cameron Thrift, Jaevon White and IT Pitstop, Inc. in Final Judgment of Forfeiture lodged herein be signed by the Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller and filed by the Clerk of the Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Oct 23 2014
DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/22/14 ORDERING that based on the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations and the files and records of the Court it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: The Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations are adopted herein. Kendall Thrift, Malissa Thrift, Cameron Thrift, Jaevon White and IT Pitstop, Inc. are held in default. A judgment by default is hereby entered against any right, title, or interest of Kendall Thrift, Malissa Thrift, Cameron Thrift, Jaevon White and IT Pitstop, Inc. in the defendant assets referenced in the above caption. A final judgment of forfeiture is hereby entered, forfeiting all right, title, and interest in the defendant assets to the United States, to be disposed of according to law. All parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. (Financial Dept)(Becknal, R)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, October 23, 2014
15 15 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/22/14 ORDERING that based on the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations and the files and records of the Court it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: The Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations are adopted herein. Kendall Thrift, Malissa Thrift, Cameron Thrift, Jaevon White and IT Pitstop, Inc. are held in default. A judgment by default is hereby entered against any right, title, or interest of Kendall Thrift, Malissa Thrift, Cameron Thrift, Jaevon White and IT Pitstop, Inc. in the defendant assets referenced in the above caption. A final judgment of forfeiture is hereby entered, forfeiting all right, title, and interest in the defendant assets to the United States, to be disposed of according to law. All parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. (Financial Dept)(Becknal, R)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 21, 2014
14 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/21/14 Recommending that Kendall Thrift, Malissa Thrift, Cameron Thrift, Jaevon White and IT Pitstop, Inc. be held in default. That the United States' MOTION for Default Judgment and Final Judgment of forfeiture12 be GRANTED; That judgment by default be entered against any right, title, or interest of potential claimants Kendall Thrift, Malissa Thrift, Cameron Thrift, Jaevon White and IT Pitstop, Inc. in the defendant currency referenced in the above caption. That a final judgment be entered, forfeiting all right, title, and interest in the defendant currency to the United States, to be disposed of according to law; That the Default Judgment and Final Judgment of Forfeiture lodged herein be signed by the Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller and filed by the Clerk of the Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 20, 2014
13 13 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/20/2014: In light of the pending Motion for Default Judgment12 and on the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 10/30/2014 is VACATED and RESET for 1/8/2015 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 06, 2014
12 12 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Final Judgment of Forfeiture by United States of America.(Khasigian, Kevin) Modified on 10/7/2014 (Kaminski, H).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order and Findings and Recommendations,
Att: 3 Proposed Default Judgment and Final Judgment of Forfeiture
Monday, August 25, 2014
11 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *It Pitstop, Inc., Cameron Thrift, Kendall Thrift, Malissa Thrift, Jaevon White* (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 19, 2014
10 10 REQUEST for Clerk for Entry of Default Against Kendall Thrift, Malissa Thrift, Jaevon White, Cameron Thrift, and IT Pitstop, Inc. by United States of America.(Khasigian, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Monday, July 21, 2014
9 9 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION filed by United States of America. Last publication date July 18, 2014. (Khasigian, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 26, 2014
8 8 NOTICE of Arrest of defendant 2012 Ford F-250 Truck and defendant 2008 Mercedes Benz CL63 AMG Couple by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 18, 2014
7 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America re3 Order,1 Complaint,2 Civil New Case Documents for KJM,4 Warrant Issued - O. (Khasigian, Kevin)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Arrest of defendants Approximately $463,960.00 in U.S. Currency and Approximately $195,590.84 seized from Bank of George on 6/12/14. Warrant for Arrest and Affidavit attached by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 12, 2014
5 5 APPLICATION and ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/12/2014 as to defendant Approximately $463,960.00 in U.S. Currency, defendant 2012 Ford F-250, defendant 2008 Mercedes Benz, and defendant Approximately $195,590.84 seized from Bank of George in Las Vegas, Nevada.(Waggoner, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 10, 2014
4 4 WARRANT for Arrest of Articles in Rem. (Becknal, R)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/10/14 ORDERING the issuance of warrant for arrest of articles in rem. (Becknal, R)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 09, 2014
2 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Becknal, R)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 KJM Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
Friday, June 06, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants by United States of America. Attorney Khasigian, Kevin Christopher added.(Khasigian, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Order - Application and Order for Publication