Original Case: 2:19-cv-05413

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-56265
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2020
Terminated:Jan 18, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jan 20, 2023 12:39 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
TODD KAPLAN
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MEDICAL INVESTOR HOLDINGS LLC, DBA Vertical Companies
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHARLES HOUGHTON
Represented By
Julian Burns King
King & Siegel LLP
contact info
Charles Houghton
contact info
Elliot Siegel
King & Siegel LLP
contact info
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MATT KAPLAN
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DREW MILBURN
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
COURTNEY DORNE
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SMOKE WALLIN
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT SCOTT KAPLAN, AKA Robert Scott
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ELYSE KAPLAN
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JEFF SILVER
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
IRON ANGEL II, LLC
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NCAMBA9, INC.
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
VERTICAL WELLNESS, INC.
Represented By
Melissa G. Fulgencio
Uplift Law
contact info
John Carl Scholz
Attorney
contact info
Leanne O. Vanecek
Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
FRANCINE SHULMAN
Represented By
Kathryn S. Christopherson
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Kristin Cope
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Christopher Edward Tutunjian
Baker Botts, LLP
contact info
Cheryl Cauley
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
IRON ANGEL, LLC
Represented By
Kathryn S. Christopherson
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Kristin Cope
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Christopher Edward Tutunjian
Baker Botts, LLP
contact info
Cheryl Cauley
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
3F, INC.
Represented By
Kathryn S. Christopherson
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Kristin Cope
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
contact info
Christopher Edward Tutunjian
Baker Botts, LLP
contact info
Cheryl Cauley
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info

GPO Jan 18 2023
FILED OPINION (MILAN D. SMITH, JR., RYAN D. NELSON and GERSHWIN A. DRAIN) AFFIRMED. Judge: MDS Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [12632356]

Docket last updated: 01/20/2023 12:35 AM PST
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants 3F, Inc., Iron Angel, LLC and Francine Shulman Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/08/2020. Transcript ordered by 12/30/2020. Transcript due 01/29/2021. Appellants 3F, Inc., Iron Angel, LLC and Francine Shulman opening brief due 03/10/2021. Appellees Courtney Dorne, Charles Houghton, Iron Angel II, LLC, Elyse Kaplan, Matt Kaplan, Robert Scott Kaplan, Todd Kaplan, Medical Investor Holdings LLC, Drew Milburn, NCAMBA9, Inc., Jeff Silver, Vertical Wellness, Inc. and Smoke Wallin answering brief due 04/09/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11910981] (JBS) [Entered: 12/01/2020 12:13 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet