Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-bcaag-01360
Typebca or pto / patent trial and appeal board
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2020
Terminated:Dec 07, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 7:39 AM EDT
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 11/24/2020. [739682] Entry of Appearance is due on 12/16/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/16/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 12/16/2020. Certified List is due on 01/11/2021. [EKD] [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:23 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 64 pgs Agency Case Docketed