Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Cj Williams
Referred: Kelly KE Mahoney
Case #: 5:20-cv-04055
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Removal-Employment Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2020
Terminated:Aug 02, 2022
Case in other court:In the Iowa District Court for Cherokee County, LACV026478
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 01, 2021 4:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Heritage Bank National Association
a Minnesota Bank Association 310 1st Street SW
Willmar, MN 56201
Represented By
Marci L Iseminger
Crary Huff Ringenberg Hartnett Storm
contact info
Daniel L Hartnett
Crary Huff Inkster Sheehan Ringenberg Hartnett Storm
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Jones
5273 V Avenue
Aureila, IA 51005
Represented By
Mary C Hamilton
Hamilton Law Firm
contact info
Steven D Hamilton
Hamilton Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Justin Rey
Terminated: 05/18/2021
Represented By
Marci L Iseminger
Crary Huff Ringenberg Hartnett Storm
contact info
Daniel L Hartnett
Crary Huff Inkster Sheehan Ringenberg Hartnett Storm
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 08/02 1:27 PM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Heritage Bank National Association, Justin Rey. (Hartnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 08/02 3:51 PM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to28 JOINT Stipulation of Dismissal. (kms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
27 27 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 07/07 11:52 AM
** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to File dismissal papers. Dismissal Papers Deadline extended and now due by 8/2/2022. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 07/07/2022. (Gollhofer, Jami)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Thu 07/07 11:43 AM
UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Deadline to File a Stipulated Dismissal by Defendant Heritage Bank National Association (Hartnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
24 24 order Case Settlement Fri 06/03 2:38 PM
ORDER of Case Settlement: The court has been advised that this action has been settled. The parties shall have to and including, the date listed at end of this docket entry, to file their settlement documents. Dismissal papers and/or status report is due by 7/5/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 6/3/2022. (skm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
23 23 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 05/26 8:28 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Resistance to21 Motion to Compel filed by Heritage Bank National Association. Defendant's deadline to respond to the pending motion to compel is extended to June 14, 2022. If the mediation is successful, the parties must promptly notify the court. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 5/26/2022. (skm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/24 11:05 AM
UNRESISTED Motion for for Additional Time to File Resistance to21 Motion to Compel by Defendant Heritage Bank National Association. (Hartnett, Daniel) Modified on 5/24/2022 to add link (kms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
21 21 motion Compel Tue 05/10 3:06 PM
MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Susan Jones (Hamilton, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Discovery Requests,
Att: 2 Exhibit Communications,
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit,
Att: 4 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Compel
Friday, May 06, 2022
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion To Continue Trial Fri 05/06 10:01 AM
ORDER denying19 Joint Unresisted Motion to Continue Trial and Pre-trial Deadlines. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 5/6/2022. (jag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
19 19 motion Continue Trial Wed 05/04 2:24 PM
JOINT UNRESISTED Motion for Continuance of Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines by Defendants Heritage Bank National Association, Justin Rey. (Hartnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 12/20 10:13 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines Discovery due by 4/26/2022. The dispositive motion deadline, final pretrial conference, and jury trial remain as previously scheduled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/20/21. (ksy)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
17 17 motion UNRESISTED Motion Fri 12/17 10:04 AM
JOINT UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline by Defendants Heritage Bank National Association, Justin Rey (Hartnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
16 16 order Hearings (Setting/Resetting) Thu 09/23 3:54 PM
ORDER Resetting Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2022 09:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing before Judge CJ Williams. Jury Trial set for 11/14/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. In addition to the deadlines Judge Mahoney listed in her order15 , the trial management order (Doc.10 ) will continue to govern this case with the new trial date substituted; all deadlines established in the trial management order shall be calculated from the substituted trial date. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 9/23/2021. (kms)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Deadline/Hearing (Cancelling) ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 09/23 11:06 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines. Completion of Discovery due by 1/10/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2022. The final pretrial conference and jury trial are continued and will be rescheduled by separate order. The case will be ready for trial on or after 11/8/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/23/2021. (sgw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
14 14 motion UNRESISTED Motion Mon 09/20 2:24 PM
UNRESISTED Motion for Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Defendant Heritage Bank National Association (Hartnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
13 13 order Protective Order Fri 09/03 10:20 AM
PROTECTIVE Order granting12 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/3/2021. (pac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
12 12 misc Stipulation Thu 09/02 2:53 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order and Order Approving Stipulation by Heritage Bank National Association, Justin Rey (Hartnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 05/17 2:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Justin Rey, only by Susan Jones (Hamilton, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
10 10 order Trial Management Order Mon 02/08 10:46 AM
TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2022 in Sioux City before Judge CJ Williams. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2022 at 9:00 AM before Judge CJ Williams. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2022. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 2/8/2021. (pac)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2021
9 9 order Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Fri 02/05 12:56 PM
SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 2/17/2021 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 4/5/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/5/2021. Plaintiff's Expert Witness due by 5/3/2021. Defendants' Expert Witnesses due by 7/6/2021. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 8/3/2021. Discovery due by 10/4/2021. Motions due by 11/4/2021. Trial Ready Deadline 4/5/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 2/5/2021. (pac)
Related: [-]
8 8 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 02/05 12:53 PM
MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Scheduling Conference held on 2/4/2021. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (pac)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
7 7 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 02/01 2:40 PM
** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** SETTING HEARING re6 PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan filed by Susan Jones - Scheduling Conference hearing set for 2/4/2021 at 11:30 AM (Telephonic Hearing - please use dial-in hearing instructions) before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The hearing will take place using the Court's conference bridge. The parties shall access the hearing by: (1) calling 877-336-1831, (2) enter access code 3495185 #, (3) press # to enter as a participant, (4) enter security code 1831 #. The call will become active upon the host (the Court) entering the conference bridge. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 02/01/2021. (Gollhofer, Jami)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Mon 02/01 11:41 AM
PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Susan Jones (Hamilton, Mary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/12 4:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Heritage Bank National Association, Justin Rey.(Hartnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement LR 7.1 Wed 12/23 10:09 AM
PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Heritage Bank National Association (Hartnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
3 3 misc Docket Annotation Fri 12/04 8:49 AM
DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the case packet used in removal cases. (pac)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc STATE Court Petition Fri 12/04 8:48 AM
STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Susan Jones. (pac)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 12/04 8:45 AM
Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/04 8:50 AM
Set Deadline: Defendant Heritage Bank, NA's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/24/2020. (pac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 12/03 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Removal from In the Iowa District Court in and for Cherokee County, case number LACV026478. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3336915), filed by Heritage Bank National Association, Justin Rey. Scheduling Report due by 2/1/2021 (Hartnett, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Original Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Petition and Jury Demand,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Returns of Service,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet